EP3046027 - SECURITY ACCESS MANAGER IN MIDDLEWARE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2016/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSSON, Jonas Karl XII gata 10B 222 20 Lund / SE | 02 /
BJÄRE, Björn Skyttelinjen 21 226 49 Lund / SE | [2016/29] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2016/29] | Application number, filing date | 16158248.1 | 22.09.2003 | [2016/29] | Priority number, date | US20020412844P | 23.09.2002 Original published format: US 412844 P | US20020412756P | 23.09.2002 Original published format: US 412756 P | US20030666673 | 19.09.2003 Original published format: US 666673 | [2016/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3046027 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46, H04L29/06, H04W4/00, H04W12/08, H04W74/00 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
H04L63/20 (EP,US);
G06F15/00 (KR);
G06F13/00 (KR);
G06F9/468 (EP,US);
H04L63/101 (EP,US);
H04W12/084 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/29] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSZUGANGSMANAGER IN MIDDLEWARE | [2016/29] | English: | SECURITY ACCESS MANAGER IN MIDDLEWARE | [2016/29] | French: | GESTIONNAIRE D'ACCES SECURISE DANS UN INTERGICIEL | [2016/29] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 13.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.11.2019 | 13.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/17] | 12.12.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03750592.2 / EP1573518 | Divisional application(s) | EP19208216.2 / EP3627321 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 12.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.01.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - LOSCOCCO PETER ET AL, "Integrating Flexible Support for Security Policies into the Linux Operating System", INTERNET CITATION, (20010102), URL: www.nsa.gov/selinux, (20020424), XP002197020 [I] 1-30 * page 1 - page 3 * * page 7 * |