EP3093800 - SYSTEM FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE AND A METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING WITHIN SAID SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/46] | EMBEDDED SENSOR SYSTEM | ||
[2019/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2016/46] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Xin 411 Silver Lane East Hartford, CT Connecticut 06108 / US | 02 /
SOLDNER, Nicholas Charles 13 Traditions Blvd Southbury, CT Connecticut 06108 / US | 03 /
TOKGOZ, Cagatay 171 Margaret Drive South Windsor, CT Connecticut 06074 / US | 04 /
MANTESE, Joseph V. 10 Shepard Way Ellington, CT Connecticut 06029 / US | 05 /
ZACCHIO, Joseph 30 Livingston Street Wethersfield, CT Connecticut 06109 / US | [2016/46] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/18] |
Former [2016/46] | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16158448.7 | 03.03.2016 | [2016/46] | Priority number, date | US201514704715 | 05.05.2015 Original published format: US201514704715 | [2016/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3093800 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3093800 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F01D21/00, F01D5/28, H04Q9/00, F01D17/02, F01D17/20, G06K19/077 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
F01D17/02 (EP,US);
F01D21/003 (US);
F01D17/20 (EP,US);
F01D5/28 (US);
G06K19/07771 (EP,US);
G06K19/07777 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/46] | G06K19/07, G06K19/077, F01D17/02, F01D17/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/25] |
Former [2016/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR EIN GASTURBINENTRIEBWERK UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOMMUNIKATION INNERHALB DES SYSTEMS | [2019/38] | English: | SYSTEM FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE AND A METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING WITHIN SAID SYSTEM | [2019/38] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION À L'INTÉRIEUR DUDIT SYSTÈME | [2019/38] |
Former [2016/46] | EINGEBETTETES SENSORSYSTEM | ||
Former [2016/46] | EMBEDDED SENSOR SYSTEM | ||
Former [2016/46] | SYSTÈME DE CAPTEUR INTÉGRÉ | Examination procedure | 03.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/25] | 27.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2016 | AL | 29.04.2020 | AT | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | DK | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | ES | 29.04.2020 | FI | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | IT | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | NL | 29.04.2020 | PL | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SE | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | NO | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | IS | 29.08.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 03.03.2016 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004113790 (HAMEL MICHAEL JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0050] - [0136] * * figure - *; | [X]EP2224379 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0016] - [0034] * * figure - *; | [X]US2011133950 (SUBRAMANIAN RAMESH [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0033] - [0115] * * figure - *; | [X]US2012197597 (MITCHELL DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0025] - [0076] * * figure - *; | [A]US2013231893 (MILLER CHRISTOPHER EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** figure - *; | [A]US2014083176 (RHODEN WILLIAM E [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure - * | Examination | US2007080810 | US2012068003 |