EP3064152 - MULTIPLE LEVEL THRESHOLDS TO MODIFY OPERATION OF POWERED SURGICAL INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon LLC 475 Street C, Suite 401 Los Frailes Industrial Park 00969 Guaynabo / PR | [2017/42] |
Former [2016/36] | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, LLC 475 Street C Los Frailes Industrial Park 00969 Guaynabo / PR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHELTON, IV, Frederick E. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 02 /
YATES, David C. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 03 /
HARRIS, Jason L. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2016/36] | Application number, filing date | 16158830.6 | 04.03.2016 | [2016/36] | Priority number, date | US201514640795 | 06.03.2015 Original published format: US201514640795 | [2016/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3064152 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3064152 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/295 (CN,US);
A61B17/068 (US);
A61B2017/00017 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00022 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00123 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00132 (CN,US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2018/00648 (US);
A61B2018/00666 (US);
A61B2090/064 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2090/0803 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] |
Former [2016/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEHRSTUFIGE SCHWELLENWERTE ZUR MODIFIZIERUNG DES BETRIEBS ANGETRIEBENER CHIRURGISCHER INSTRUMENTE | [2016/36] | English: | MULTIPLE LEVEL THRESHOLDS TO MODIFY OPERATION OF POWERED SURGICAL INSTRUMENTS | [2016/36] | French: | SEUILS DE NIVEAU MULTIPLES POUR MODIFIER LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'INSTRUMENTS CHIRURGICAUX À FONCTIONNEMENT ÉLECTRIQUE | [2016/36] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 11.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17199779.4 / EP3311761 | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2016 | AL | 08.11.2017 | AT | 08.11.2017 | CY | 08.11.2017 | CZ | 08.11.2017 | DK | 08.11.2017 | EE | 08.11.2017 | ES | 08.11.2017 | FI | 08.11.2017 | HR | 08.11.2017 | LT | 08.11.2017 | LV | 08.11.2017 | MC | 08.11.2017 | MK | 08.11.2017 | NL | 08.11.2017 | PT | 08.11.2017 | RO | 08.11.2017 | RS | 08.11.2017 | SE | 08.11.2017 | SI | 08.11.2017 | SK | 08.11.2017 | SM | 08.11.2017 | TR | 08.11.2017 | BG | 08.02.2018 | NO | 08.02.2018 | GR | 09.02.2018 | IE | 04.03.2018 | LU | 04.03.2018 | MT | 04.03.2018 | IS | 08.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 04.03.2016 | |
AT | 08.11.2017 | ||
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
MK | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
MT | 04.03.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 04.03.2016 | |
AT | 08.11.2017 | ||
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
MT | 04.03.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
MT | 04.03.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
MT | 04.03.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
MT | 04.03.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 08.11.2017 | |
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2283780 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]); | [XAYI]US2012248167 (FLANAGAN PATRICK [US], et al); | [E]EP3001279 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) | by applicant | US2012298719 | US8608045 | US2014263541 | US2014263539 | US2014263538 |