EP3067023 - SYSTEM, METHOD, AND DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING A BODY PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spidertech Inc. 115 Ridgetop Road Toronto, Ontario M1P 4W9 / CA | [2016/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARBESMAN, Ray 42 Burton Road Toronto, Ontario M5P 1V2 / CA | 02 /
MACKELVIE, Winston 20 Kimball Road Knowlton, Québec J0E 1V0 / CA | [2016/37] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Simon John Nye Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2018/26] |
Former [2016/37] | Goodman, Simon John Nye Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 16159013.8 | 07.03.2016 | [2016/37] | Priority number, date | US201562130816P | 10.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562130816 P | [2016/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3067023 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3067023 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/00, A61F5/01, A61F13/02 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
A61F13/00059 (EP,US);
A61F5/40 (KR);
A61F13/00 (CN);
A61F13/023 (US);
A61F13/00051 (CN);
A61F13/00085 (EP,US);
A61F13/025 (KR);
A61F13/0269 (KR);
A61F13/0273 (EP,US);
A61F5/028 (EP,US);
A61F5/03 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00119 (CN,KR);
A61F2013/00127 (CN);
A61F2013/0028 (KR,US);
A61F2013/00655 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] |
Former [2016/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABSTÜTZEN EINES KÖRPERTEILES | [2016/37] | English: | SYSTEM, METHOD, AND DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING A BODY PART | [2016/37] | French: | SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR SUPPORTER UNE PARTIE DU CORPS | [2016/37] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 11.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2016 | AL | 27.06.2018 | AT | 27.06.2018 | CY | 27.06.2018 | CZ | 27.06.2018 | DK | 27.06.2018 | EE | 27.06.2018 | ES | 27.06.2018 | FI | 27.06.2018 | HR | 27.06.2018 | IT | 27.06.2018 | LT | 27.06.2018 | LV | 27.06.2018 | MC | 27.06.2018 | MK | 27.06.2018 | NL | 27.06.2018 | PL | 27.06.2018 | RO | 27.06.2018 | RS | 27.06.2018 | SE | 27.06.2018 | SI | 27.06.2018 | SK | 27.06.2018 | SM | 27.06.2018 | TR | 27.06.2018 | BG | 27.09.2018 | NO | 27.09.2018 | GR | 28.09.2018 | IS | 27.10.2018 | PT | 29.10.2018 | IE | 07.03.2019 | LU | 07.03.2019 | MT | 07.03.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 07.03.2016 | |
AL | 27.06.2018 | ||
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CY | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
IE | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 07.03.2019 | ||
MT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CY | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
IE | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 07.03.2019 | ||
MT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
IE | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 07.03.2019 | ||
MT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 07.03.2019 | ||
LU | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0051935 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 15 * figure - * * claim 1 *[A] 1-14; | [AD]US2011015556 (FABO TOMAS [SE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0008] *; | [YDA]US8742196 (ARBESMAN RAY [CA], et al) [YD] 15 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 8 * [A] 1-14; | [A]WO2014190416 (SPIDERTECH INC [CA]) [A] 1-15 * figures 5-7 * * page 3, line 8 - line 18 * * page 8, line 1 - line 12 * | by applicant | US2011015556 | US8742196 |