EP3091184 - TURBINE AIRFOIL LEADING EDGE COOLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2016/45] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEWIS, Scott D. 9 Grandview Terrace Vernon, CT Connecticut 06066 / US | [2016/45] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/02] |
Former [2016/45] | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16159217.5 | 08.03.2016 | [2016/45] | Priority number, date | US201514707887 | 08.05.2015 Original published format: US201514707887 | [2016/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3091184 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3091184 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
F01D5/186 (EP,US);
F01D5/187 (US);
F01D25/12 (US);
F01D25/30 (US);
F01D5/147 (US);
F01D9/041 (US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2230/13 (EP,US);
F05D2240/12 (US);
F05D2240/121 (EP,US);
F05D2240/30 (US);
F05D2240/303 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] |
Former [2016/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KÜHLUNG DER VORDERKANTE EINER TURBINENSCHAUFEL | [2021/03] | English: | TURBINE AIRFOIL LEADING EDGE COOLING | [2016/45] | French: | REFROIDISSEMENT DU BORD D'ATTAQUE D'UNE AUBE DE TURBINE | [2016/45] |
Former [2016/45] | KÜHLUNG DER VODERKANTE EINER TURBINENSCHAUFEL | Examination procedure | 08.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 24.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2016 | AL | 12.01.2022 | AT | 12.01.2022 | CY | 12.01.2022 | CZ | 12.01.2022 | DK | 12.01.2022 | EE | 12.01.2022 | ES | 12.01.2022 | FI | 12.01.2022 | HR | 12.01.2022 | IT | 12.01.2022 | LT | 12.01.2022 | LV | 12.01.2022 | MC | 12.01.2022 | MK | 12.01.2022 | MT | 12.01.2022 | NL | 12.01.2022 | PL | 12.01.2022 | RO | 12.01.2022 | RS | 12.01.2022 | SE | 12.01.2022 | SI | 12.01.2022 | SK | 12.01.2022 | SM | 12.01.2022 | IE | 08.03.2022 | LU | 08.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | BG | 12.04.2022 | NO | 12.04.2022 | GR | 13.04.2022 | IS | 12.05.2022 | PT | 12.05.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 08.03.2016 | |
AL | 12.01.2022 | ||
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
MK | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 08.03.2022 | ||
LU | 08.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 08.03.2016 | |
AL | 12.01.2022 | ||
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 08.03.2022 | ||
LU | 08.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 08.03.2016 | |
AL | 12.01.2022 | ||
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 08.03.2022 | ||
LU | 08.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 08.03.2022 | ||
LU | 08.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 08.03.2022 | ||
LU | 08.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 08.03.2022 | ||
LU | 08.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 08.03.2022 | ||
LU | 08.03.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 12.01.2022 | |
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 12.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2005265838 (LIANG GEORGE [US]) [X] 1-3,5-13 * paragraphs [0019] - [0003] * * figures 1-3 * [A] 4; | [XA]US2006107668 (CUNHA FRANK J [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-15 * abstract * * figure 4 * [A] 10; | [XI]US2010119377 (TIBBOTT IAN [GB], et al) [X] 1,3-9,11-14 * paragraphs [0037] - [0079] * * figure 10 *[I] 10; | [X]EP2844839 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,3-7,12,13,15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2015035363 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-9,11-15 * abstract * * figure 3 * | Examination | WO2015112225 | EP3074606 |