EP3073396 - A METHOD OF MODELLING AT LEAST A PART OF A GAS TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | [2020/09] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 62 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Feng c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | 02 /
di Mare, Luca c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | [2016/39] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/39] | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16159445.2 | 09.03.2016 | [2016/39] | Priority number, date | GB20150004921 | 24.03.2015 Original published format: GB 201504921 | [2016/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3073396 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50 | [2016/39] | CPC: |
G06F30/15 (EP,US);
G06F30/00 (GB);
G06F30/17 (US);
G06F30/39 (US);
G06F2111/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] |
Former [2016/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM MODELLIEREN MINDESTENS EINES TEILS EINES GASTURBINENMOTORS | [2016/39] | English: | A METHOD OF MODELLING AT LEAST A PART OF A GAS TURBINE ENGINE | [2016/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MODÉLISATION D'AU MOINS UNE PARTIE D'UN MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ | [2016/39] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 01.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/28] | 02.06.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.09.2021 | 23.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002177985 (KRAFT JOSEPH ANTHONY [US], et al) [Y] 1,10,11 * see paragraphs [0040] and [0044] *; | [Y] - Feng Wang, "Whole Aero-Engine Meshing and CFD Simulation", Thesis, (20130720), pages 156 - 182, URL: spiral.imperial.ac.uk/handle/10044/1/27235, (20160418), XP055266382 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document, see in particular the section 8.2 VE Device Tree, 8.3.1 Turbomachinery Blade Meshing and the passage Automatic analysis set-up on page 179 * | [Y] - SHEPHARD M S ET AL, "Toward simulation-based design", FINITE ELEMENTS IN ANALYSIS AND DESIGN, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20040731), vol. 40, no. 12, doi:10.1016/J.FINEL.2003.11.004, ISSN 0168-874X, pages 1575 - 1598, XP002399934 [Y] 1-11 * section 3, in particular the passage bridging pages 1580 and 1581 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.finel.2003.11.004 | [Y] - Feng Wang ET AL, "Automated Hex Meshing for Turbomachinery Secondary Air System", Proceedings of the 21st International Meshing Roundtable, (20120418), pages 549 - 566, URL: http://rd.springer.com/chapter/10.1007/978-3-642-33573-0_32, (20160418), XP055266455 [Y] 8 * p. 3, section 2 The General Assembly, first full paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-33573-0_32 |