EP3216709 - SHAFT SYSTEM COMPRISING A PLURALITY OF PARALLEL RECEIVING SHAFTS FOR RECEIVING FILM BAGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDAG Gesellschaft für Industriebedarf mbH & Co. Betriebs KG Rudolf-Wild-Strasse 107 - 115 69214 Eppelheim / DE | [2017/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sander, Jörg Gundolfstraße 3 69120 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Treu, Roland Am Hang 10 69226 Nußloch / DE | 03 /
Hartung-Rey, Sönke Liselottestraße 16 69123 Heidelberg / DE | [2017/37] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/37] | Application number, filing date | 16159775.2 | 11.03.2016 | [2017/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3216709 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3216709 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B65B43/14, B65B59/04, B65H1/04, B65H1/06, B65H1/28, B65H31/20 | [2017/37] | CPC: |
B65B43/14 (EP,US);
B65B59/04 (EP,US);
B65H1/06 (US);
B65H1/28 (US);
B65H2511/10 (EP,US);
B65H2511/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/45] |
Former [2017/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHACHTSYSTEM UMFASSEND MEHRERE PARALLEL NEBENEINANDER ANGEORDNETE AUFNAHMESCHÄCHTE ZUM AUFNEHMEN VON FOLIENBEUTELN | [2017/37] | English: | SHAFT SYSTEM COMPRISING A PLURALITY OF PARALLEL RECEIVING SHAFTS FOR RECEIVING FILM BAGS | [2017/37] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMPARTIMENT COMPRENANT PLUSIEURS COMPARTIMENTS DE RECEPTION ADJACENTS PARALLELES DESTINES A RECEVOIR DES SACHETS DE FEUILLES | [2017/37] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/45] | 08.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2016 | AL | 06.06.2018 | CY | 06.06.2018 | CZ | 06.06.2018 | DK | 06.06.2018 | EE | 06.06.2018 | FI | 06.06.2018 | HR | 06.06.2018 | LT | 06.06.2018 | LV | 06.06.2018 | MC | 06.06.2018 | MK | 06.06.2018 | MT | 06.06.2018 | NL | 06.06.2018 | PL | 06.06.2018 | RO | 06.06.2018 | RS | 06.06.2018 | SE | 06.06.2018 | SI | 06.06.2018 | SK | 06.06.2018 | SM | 06.06.2018 | TR | 06.06.2018 | BG | 06.09.2018 | NO | 06.09.2018 | GR | 07.09.2018 | IS | 06.10.2018 | PT | 08.10.2018 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/48] | HU | 11.03.2016 | |
AL | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
MT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 11.03.2016 | |
AL | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
MT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
MT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 06.06.2018 | |
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0631952 (FERAG AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * figure 10 *; | [A]EP0714839 (ELPATRONIC AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * column 5, line 11 - line 24; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0997420 (WILL E C H GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012]; figures 1-3 *; | [XI]DE69607594T (ALGONQUIN IND INC [US]) [X] 1,4-12 * page 11, line 20 - line 23; figures 1, 4, 19 * [I] 2,3,13-15; | [A]EP1125717 (ILLIG ADOLF [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0014]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6367653 (RUSKIN FRANK [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 10, line 1 - line 22; figure 14 * * page 12, line 64 - line 66 *; | [A]US2005053455 (JASPERS JERRY [US], et al) [A] 14,15* paragraph [0054]; figures 13, 15 *; | [X]WO2013182305 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * page 16, line 9 - line 25; figure 1a *; | [XI]EP2708482 (GRAPHIC PACKAGING INT INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0018]; figures 1-8 * [I] 3; | [A]DE102013105913 (KHS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * |