EP3067632 - COMPOSITE PANEL WITH INTEGRATED HEATER AND ASSOCIATED METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/12] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | ||
Former [2016/37] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUCE, Jeffrey L. The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | 02 /
MARSHALLl IV, Joseph A. The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | 03 /
HOUSE, Ashley The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | 04 /
TURNER, Jason The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2023/41] |
Former [2016/37] | 01 /
DUCE, Jeffrey L. The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | ||
02 /
MARSHALLl IV, Joseph A. The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | |||
03 /
HOUSE, Ashley The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | |||
04 /
TURNER, Jason The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US | Representative(s) | Duxbury, Stephen, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bavariaring 17 80336 München / DE | [2016/37] | Application number, filing date | 16159893.3 | 11.03.2016 | [2016/37] | Priority number, date | US201514656220 | 12.03.2015 Original published format: US201514656220 | [2016/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3067632 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3067632 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F24D13/02, F24H9/18, H05B3/06, H05B3/20, H05B3/08, H05B1/02, H05B3/34, B60N2/56 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
H05B1/0236 (EP,US);
H05B3/36 (CN);
B60N2/5685 (EP);
B64C1/10 (CN);
B64C1/18 (CN);
F24D13/022 (EP,US);
F24H9/1872 (EP,US);
H01C17/02 (US);
H01C17/075 (US);
H05B1/0238 (EP,US);
H05B3/06 (EP,US);
H05B3/18 (US);
H05B3/20 (EP,US);
H05B3/34 (EP,US);
F24D2200/08 (EP,US);
F24D2220/2081 (EP,US);
H05B2203/013 (EP,US);
H05B2203/017 (EP,CN,US);
H05B2203/02 (EP,US);
H05B2203/026 (EP,US);
H05B2203/029 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/37] | F24D13/02, H05B3/00, F24H9/18, H05B3/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] | Title | German: | VERBUNDPLATTE MIT INTEGRIERTEM HEIZER UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2016/37] | English: | COMPOSITE PANEL WITH INTEGRATED HEATER AND ASSOCIATED METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING | [2016/37] | French: | PANNEAU COMPOSITE AVEC ÉLÉMENT CHAUFFANT INTÉGRÉ ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS DE FABRICATION | [2016/37] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/37] | 28.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2024 | BG | 21.02.2024 | ES | 21.02.2024 | FI | 21.02.2024 | HR | 21.02.2024 | LT | 21.02.2024 | LV | 21.02.2024 | NL | 21.02.2024 | PL | 21.02.2024 | SE | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | PT | 21.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
LV | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
PL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
PT | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 21.02.2024 | |
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 21.02.2024 | |
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004100131 (HOWICK SHAUN CALVIN [CA], et al) [X] 1-8,10-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0025] - [0027]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0037] , [0042] , [0045] * * paragraphs [0006] , [0061] , [0067] , [0075] - [0077] * * paragraphs [0079] , [0091]; figure 4 * [I] 9,13; | [XA]DE102008058529 (GENDELMAN JAAKOV [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6,11,14,15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0013] , [0018]; figure 3; claims 2,12 *[A] 2,5,7-10,12,13; | [XI]US2011226751 (LAZANJA MARINKO [CA], et al) [X] 1-7,10-12,14 * paragraph [0116]; figure 2a * * paragraphs [0042] , [0050] , [0061] , [0064] - [0066] * [I] 8,9,13,15 | Examination | US6084217 | US2008083721 |