EP3088420 - BISPECIFIC ANTI-HER ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2016/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUH, Germaine 149 Amapola Avenue Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | 02 /
SCHAEFER, Gabriele 1307 Birch Avenue San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | 03 /
HABER, Lauric 3332 La Mesa Drive, Apt. 2 San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 04 /
SLIWKOWSKI, Mark X. 42 Oak Creek Lane San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | [2016/44] | Representative(s) | Woolley, Lindsey Claire, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2016/44] | Application number, filing date | 16159976.6 | 19.03.2010 | [2016/44] | Priority number, date | US20090210562P | 20.03.2009 Original published format: US 210562 P | [2016/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3088420 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C07K16/32 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/28 (KR,US);
A61K47/6851 (KR);
A61P35/04 (EP);
C07K16/2863 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/32 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/507 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BISPEZIFISCHE ANTI-HER-ANTIKÖRPER | [2016/44] | English: | BISPECIFIC ANTI-HER ANTIBODIES | [2016/44] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-HER BISPÉCIFIQUES | [2016/44] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/43] | 09.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/43] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10710142.0 / EP2408817 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006091209 (MERRIMACK PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * pages 67-71; figure 3 * [I] 1-19; | [I]WO2007042289 (ABLYNX NV [BE], et al) [I] 1-19* page 94, lines 31-33 * | by applicant | US3773919 | US3896111 | US4137230 | US4151042 | US4248870 | US4256746 | US4260608 | US4265814 | US4294757 | US4307016 | US4308268 | US4308269 | US4309428 | US4313946 | US4315929 | US4317821 | US4322348 | US4331598 | US4361650 | US4362663 | US4364866 | US4371533 | US4424219 | US4450254 | WO8707646 | US4816567 | WO8910412 | US4935341 | US4943533 | US4968603 | US4970198 | US4975278 | EP0404097 | WO9102062 | WO9105264 | WO9110741 | US5053394 | US5079233 | US5183884 | WO9303741 | US5208020 | US5212290 | WO9311161 | WO9312220 | WO9316185 | WO9321319 | WO9321232 | WO9400136 | US5288477 | WO9411026 | EP0599274 | WO9422478 | US5362852 | WO9429351 | US5401638 | US5416064 | EP0656367 | EP0659439 | US5457105 | EP0412116 | US5475001 | US5480968 | WO9607321 | US5500362 | EP0494135 | US5514554 | EP0711565 | WO9616673 | US5545806 | US5545807 | EP0502812 | EP0425235 | US5569825 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | US5571894 | US5585089 | WO9640210 | WO9640789 | US5587458 | WO9700271 | US5591669 | US5604107 | US5606040 | US5616582 | US5625126 | US5624821 | WO9717852 | US5633425 | US5635483 | WO9720858 | US5641869 | US5641870 | US5648237 | US5648260 | US5654307 | WO9730087 | US5661016 | US5663149 | US5677171 | US5679683 | WO9738731 | US5693762 | US5705157 | WO9802463 | US5712374 | US5714586 | US5720937 | US5720954 | US5725856 | WO9814451 | US5739116 | WO9817797 | US5747498 | US5747261 | WO9818489 | US5760041 | WO9824893 | US5767285 | US5770599 | US5770195 | US5770701 | US5770710 | US5772997 | US5773001 | US5780588 | US5783186 | US5783404 | US5789199 | WO9833914 | US5804396 | US5821337 | WO9845479 | US5824311 | WO9850433 | WO9850038 | US5837243 | US5840523 | US5846749 | WO9858964 | US5856089 | EP0554441 | US5866572 | WO9909016 | US5877305 | US5877296 | US5891996 | WO9919488 | WO9922764 | WO9924037 | US5910486 | WO9931140 | US5922845 | US5925519 | US5939531 | US5959177 | WO9948527 | WO9951642 | US5968511 | US5977322 | EP0616812 | WO9955367 | US5985553 | US5994071 | US6002008 | US6015567 | US6028059 | US6040498 | US6054297 | EP1006194 | US6084095 | US6123939 | WO0061145 | WO0061185 | WO0061739 | US6140332 | WO0069460 | US6165464 | WO0078347 | WO0100245 | WO0100238 | WO0100244 | WO0105425 | WO0109187 | US6194551 | WO0115730 | WO0120033 | WO0121192 | US6214388 | WO0129246 | WO0132155 | US6235883 | US6265410 | WO0153354 | US6267958 | US6270765 | WO0156604 | WO0164246 | WO0176630 | WO0176586 | EP0444181 | WO0187336 | WO0187334 | WO0189566 | US6333169 | US6333398 | US6333348 | US6339142 | WO0205791 | US6344459 | US6344455 | WO0209754 | WO0211677 | US2002031515 | US6358682 | WO0231140 | US2002051785 | US6387371 | US6391874 | US6395272 | US2002064785 | US6399602 | US6399063 | WO0244413 | US6403630 | WO0245653 | US6407213 | US2002076695 | US2002076408 | US6417168 | US6417335 | US6417429 | US2002090662 | US6420548 | WO02055106 | WO02070008 | US6455534 | US6458356 | US2002141993 | US2002142328 | US2002155527 | WO02087619 | US2002164328 | WO02088172 | WO02089842 | US6489447 | US2002192211 | US2002192652 | WO03006509 | US6512097 | US2003022918 | WO03012072 | WO03011878 | US6521620 | US2003059790 | WO03028638 | US2003068318 | US2003086924 | WO03041736 | US6573043 | US2003103973 | US2003108545 | US2003115614 | US6582919 | US2003134344 | US6596726 | US2003144252 | US6602863 | US6602670 | US6602684 | US2003147884 | US2003152987 | US2003152572 | US2003157097 | US2003157108 | US2003165840 | US2003170234 | US2003175845 | US6627196 | US6632979 | WO03085119 | WO03084570 | WO03085107 | WO03087131 | WO03086467 | EP1357132 | US2003202973 | US2003211530 | US2003228663 | US2004013667 | WO2004008099 | US6685940 | EP1391213 | WO2004024866 | US6713484 | US6719971 | US2004082047 | US2004093621 | US6737056 | US2004106161 | WO2004048525 | US2004110704 | US2004110282 | US2004109865 | US2004132140 | WO2004056312 | US2004138160 | US6767541 | US6797814 | US6800738 | WO2004087207 | US6821515 | US2004236078 | US2004258685 | US2005002928 | US2005014934 | WO2005035586 | WO2005035778 | US2005123546 | WO2005053742 | US2005186208 | WO2005100402 | WO2006029879 | WO2006073941 | US7097840 | US7125978 | US7332581 | US2008069820 | US7371826 | WO2008077546 | US7521541 | - BASELGA; MENDELSOHN, PHARMAC. THER., (1994), vol. 64, pages 127 - 154 | - MASUI ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1984), vol. 44, pages 1002 - 1007 | - WU ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1995), vol. 95, pages 1897 - 1905 | - SLAMON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 235, pages 177 - 182 | - SLAMON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 707 - 712 | - KING ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, page 974 | - YOKOTA ET AL., LANCET, (1986), vol. 1, pages 765 - 767 | - FUKUSHIGE ET AL., MOL CELL BIOL., (1986), vol. 6, pages 955 - 958 | - GUERIN ET AL., ONCOGENE RES., (1988), vol. 3, pages 21 - 31 | - COHEN ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1989), vol. 4, pages 81 - 88 | - YONEMURA ET AL., CANCER RES., (1991), vol. 51, page 1034 | - BORST ET AL., GYNECOL. ONCOL., (1990), vol. 38, page 364 | - WEINER ET AL., CANCER RES., (1990), vol. 50, pages 421 - 425 | - KERN ET AL., CANCER RES., (1990), vol. 50, page 5184 | - PARK ET AL., CANCER RES., (1989), vol. 49, page 6605 | - ZHAU ET AL., MOL. CARCINOG., (1990), vol. 3, pages 254 - 257 | - AASLAND ET AL., BR. J. CANCER, (1988), vol. 57, pages 358 - 363 | - WILLIAMS ET AL., PATHOBIOLOGY, (1991), vol. 59, pages 46 - 52 | - MCCANN ET AL., CANCER, (1990), vol. 65, pages 88 - 92 | - GU ET AL., CANCER LETT., (1996), vol. 99, pages 185 - 9 | - ROSS ET AL., HUM. PATHOL., (1997), vol. 28, pages 827 - 33 | - ROSS ET AL., CANCER, (1997), vol. 79, pages 2162 - 70 | - SADASIVAN ET AL., J. UROL., (1993), vol. 150, pages 126 - 31 | - DREBIN ET AL., CELL, (1985), vol. 41, pages 695 - 706 | - MYERS ET AL., METH. ENZYM., (1991), vol. 198, pages 277 - 290 | - DREBIN ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1988), vol. 2, pages 273 - 277 | - HUDZIAK ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1989), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 1165 - 1172 | - FENDLY ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1990), vol. 50, pages 1550 - 1558 | - KOTTS ET AL., VITRO, (1990), vol. 26, no. 3, page 59A | - SARUP ET AL., GROWTH REGULATION, (1991), vol. 1, pages 72 - 82 | - SHEPARD ET AL., J. CLIN. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 117 - 127 | - KUMAR ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 979 - 986 | - LEWIS ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER., (1993), vol. 37, pages 255 - 263 | - PIETRAS ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1994), vol. 9, pages 1829 - 1838 | - VITETTA ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 54, pages 5301 - 5309 | - SLIWKOWSKI ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, no. 20, pages 14661 - 14665 | - SCOTT ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, pages 14300 - 5 | - D'SOUZA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1994), vol. 91, pages 7202 - 7206 | - LEWIS ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 56, pages 1457 - 1465 | - SCHAEFER ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1997), vol. 15, pages 1385 - 1394 | - BASELGA ET AL., J. CLIN. ONCOL., (1996), vol. 14, pages 737 - 744 | - TAGLIABUE ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1991), vol. 47, pages 933 - 937 | - MCKENZIE ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1989), vol. 4, pages 543 - 548 | - MAIER ET AL., CANCER RES., (1991), vol. 51, pages 5361 - 5369 | - BACUS ET AL., MOLECULAR CARCINOGENESIS, (1990), vol. 3, pages 350 - 362 | - STANCOVSKI ET AL., PNAS (USA), (1991), vol. 88, pages 8691 - 8695 | - BACUS ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1992), vol. 52, pages 2580 - 2589 | - XU ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1993), vol. 53, pages 401 - 408 | - KASPRZYK ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1992), vol. 52, pages 2771 - 2776 | - HANCOCK ET AL., CANCER RES., (1991), vol. 51, pages 4575 - 4580 | - SHAWVER ET AL., CANCER RES., (1994), vol. 54, pages 1367 - 1373 | - ARTEAGA ET AL., CANCER RES., (1994), vol. 54, pages 3758 - 3765 | - HARWERTH ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, pages 15160 - 15167 | - KLAPPER ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1997), vol. 14, pages 2099 - 2109 | - KRAUS ET AL., PNAS (USA), (1989), vol. 86, pages 9193 - 9197 | - PLOWMAN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 1746 - 1750 | - PLOWMAN ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 366, pages 473 - 475 | - EARP ET AL., BREAST CANCER RESEARCH AND TREATMENT, (1995), vol. 35, pages 115 - 132 | - GROENEN ET AL., GROWTH FACTORS, (1994), vol. 11, pages 235 - 257 | - HOLMES ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 256, pages 1205 - 1210 | - LEMKE, G., MOLEC. & CELL. NEUROSCI., (1996), vol. 7, pages 247 - 262 | - LEE ET AL., PHARM. REV., (1995), vol. 47, pages 51 - 85 | - CHANG ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 387, pages 509 - 512 | - CARRAWAY ET AL., NATURE, (1997), vol. 387, pages 512 - 516 | - ZHANG ET AL., PNAS (USA, (1997), vol. 94, no. 18, pages 9562 - 7 | - HARARI ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1999), vol. 18, pages 2681 - 89 | - LEVI ET AL., JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (1995), vol. 15, pages 1329 - 1340 | - MORRISSEY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 1431 - 1435 | - LEWIS ET AL., CANCER RES., (1996), vol. 56, pages 1457 - 1465 | - CARRAWAY; CANTLEY, CELL, (1994), vol. 78, pages 5 - 8 | - ARTEAGA CL, J CLIN ONCOL, (2003), vol. 21, pages 289 - 91 S | - HOSHI S ET AL., GAN TO KAGAKU RYOHO, (2004), vol. 31, pages 1209 - 13 | - VILORIA-PETIT AM; KERBEL RS, INT J RADIAT ONCOL BIOL PHYS, (2004), vol. 58, pages 914 - 26 | - BIANCO R ET AL., ENDOCR RELAT CANCER, (2005), vol. 12, pages 159 - 71 | - ENGELMAN JA; JANNE PA., CLIN CANCER RES, (2008), vol. 14, pages 2895 - 9 | - DAVOLI A ET AL., CANCER CHEMOTHER PHARMACOL., (2010), vol. 65, no. 4, pages 611 - 23 | - POHLMANN PR ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES., (2009), vol. 15, no. 24, pages 7479 - 7491 | - ROBERT ET AL., LANCET ONCOLOGY, (2005), vol. 6, pages 491 - 500 | - DANIEL P. STITES, ABBA 1. TERR AND TRISTRAM G. PARSLOW, Basic and Clinical Immunology 8th edition,, APPLETON & LANGE, (1994), page 71 | - XU ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2000), vol. 13, pages 37 - 45 | - JOHNSON; WU, Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMAN PRESS, (2003), vol. 248, pages 1 - 25 | - HAMERS-CASTERMAN ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 363, pages 446 - 448 | - SHERIFF ET AL., NATURE STRUCT. BIOL., (1996), vol. 3, pages 733 - 736 | - CHOTHIA; LESK, J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - MARKS ET AL., BIO/1ECNNOLOGV, (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - BARBAS ET AL., PROC NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 3809 - 3813 | - SCHIER ET AL., GENE, (1995), vol. 169, pages 147 - 155 | - YELTON ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 155, pages 1994 - 2004 | - JACKSON ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 154, no. 7, pages 3310 - 9 | - HAWKINS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 226, pages 889 - 896 | - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - HAMMERLING ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and T-Cell Hybridomas, ELSEVIER, (1981), pages 563 - 681 | - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628 | - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - SIDHU ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 338, no. 2, pages 299 - 310 | - LEE ET AL., J.MOL.BIOL., (2004), vol. 340, no. 5, pages 1073 - 1093 | - FELLOUSE, PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2004), vol. 101, no. 34, pages 12467 - 12472 | - LEE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2004), vol. 284, no. 1-2, pages 119 - 132 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, page 2551 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, pages 255 - 258 | - BRUGGEMANN ET AL., YEAR IN IMMUNO., (1993), vol. 7, page 33 | - MARKS ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - LONBERG ET AL., NATURE, (1994), vol. 368, pages 856 - 859 | - MORRISON, NATURE, (1994), vol. 368, pages 812 - 813 | - FISHWILD ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, pages 845 - 851 | - NEUBERGER, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, page 826 | - LONBERG; HUSZAR, INTERN. REV. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 13, pages 65 - 93 | - ZAPATA ET AL., PROTEIN ENG., (1995), vol. 8, no. 10, pages 1057 - 1062 | - PLUCKTHUN, The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibodies, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315 | - HOLLINGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - KABAT ET AL., Sequences of Proteins of Immunological Interest, NIH PUBLICATION 91-3242, (1991), vol. 1-3 | - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 329 | - PRESTA, CURR. OP. STRUCT. BIOL., (1992), vol. 2, pages 593 - 596 | - CARPENTER ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1987), vol. 56, pages 881 - 914 | - ULLRICH ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 309, page 418425 | - HUMPHREY ET AL., PNAS (USA), (1990), vol. 87, pages 4207 - 4211 | - LYNCH ET AL., NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (2004), vol. 350, page 2129 | - PAEZ ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 304, page 1497 | - PAO ET AL., PNAS, (2004), vol. 101, page 13306 | - SEMBA ET AL., PNAS (USA), (1985), vol. 82, pages 6497 - 6501 | - YAMAMOTO ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 319, pages 230 - 234 | - GARRETT ET AL., MOL. CELL.., (2003), vol. 11, pages 495 - 505 | - CHO ET AL., NATURE, (2003), vol. 421, pages 756 - 760 | - FRANKLIN ET AL., CANCER CELL, (2004), vol. 5, pages 317 - 328 | - PLOWMAN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1993), vol. 90, pages 1746 - 1750 | - SAVAGE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1972), vol. 247, pages 7612 - 7621 | - MARQUARDT ET AL., SCIENCE, (1984), vol. 223, pages 1079 - 1082 | - SHOYAB ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 243, pages 1074 - 1076 | - KIMURA ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 257 - 260 | - COOK ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 11, pages 2547 - 2557 | - SHING ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 259, pages 1604 - 1607 | - SASADA ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1993), vol. 190, page 1173 | - HIGASHIYAMA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 251, pages 936 - 939 | - TOYODA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, pages 7495 - 7500 | - KOMURASAKI ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1997), vol. 15, pages 2841 - 2848 | - ZHANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1997), vol. 94, pages 9562 - 9567 | - KANNAN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, no. 6, pages 3330 - 3335 | - MARCHIONNI ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, pages 312 - 318 | - PELES ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 69, pages 205 - 216 | - FALLS ET AL., CELL, (1993), vol. 72, pages 801 - 815 | - HO ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, pages 14523 - 14532 | - JOHNS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 279, no. 29, pages 30375 - 30384 | - STRAGLIOTTO ET AL., EUR. J. CANCER, (1996), vol. 32A, pages 636 - 640 | - RAVETCH; KINET, ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 9, pages 457 - 92 | - CLYNES ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 652 - 656 | - DAËRON, ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 15, pages 203 - 234 | - RAVETCH; KINET, ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 9, pages 457 - 492 | - CAPEL ET AL., IMMUNOMETHODS, (1994), vol. 4, pages 25 - 34 | - DE HAAS ET AL., J. LAB. CLIN. MED., (1995), vol. 126, pages 330 - 41 | - GUYER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1976), vol. 117, page 587 | - KIM ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, page 249 | - GAZZANO-SANTORO ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1996), vol. 202, page 163 | - NICOLAOU ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM INTL. ED. ENGL., (1994), vol. 33, pages 183 - 186 | - LACOUTURE, M.E., NATURE REV. CANCER, (2006), vol. 6, pages 803 - 812 | - CUNNINGHAM; WELLS, SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085 | - WRIGHT ET AL., TIBTECH, (1997), vol. 15, pages 26 - 32 | - OKAZAKI ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 336, pages 1239 - 1249 | - YAMANE-OHNUKI ET AL., BIOTECH. BIOENG, (2004), vol. 87, page 614 | - RIPKA ET AL., ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1986), vol. 249, pages 533 - 545 | - YAMANE-OHNUKI ET AL., BIOTECH. BIOENG., (2004), vol. 87, page 614 | - KANDA, Y. ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (2006), vol. 94, no. 4, pages 680 - 688 | - HELLSTROM, I. ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. USA, (1986), vol. 83, pages 7059 - 7063 | - HELLSTROM, I ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, pages 1499 - 1502 | - BRUGGEMANN, M. ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1987), vol. 166, pages 1351 - 1361 | - CLYNES ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 652 - 656 | - CRAGG, M.S. ET AL., BLOOD, (2003), vol. 101, pages 1045 - 1052 | - CRAGG, M.S.; M.J. GLENNIE, BLOOD, (2004), vol. 103, pages 2738 - 2743 | - PETKOVA, S.B. ET AL., INT'L. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 18, no. 12, pages 1759 - 1769 | - SHIELDS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 6591 - 6604 | - IDUSOGIE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 164, pages 4178 - 4184 | - DUNCAN; WINTER, NATURE, (1988), vol. 322, pages 738 - 40 | - KAM ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2005), vol. 102, pages 11600 - 11605 | - A. L. LEHNINGER, Biochemistry, SECOND ED.,, WORTH PUBLISHERS, (1975), pages 73 - 75 | - LAMBERT, J., CURR. OPINION IN PHARMACOLOGY, (2005), vol. 5, pages 543 - 549 | - WU ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 23, no. 9, pages 1137 - 1146 | - SYRIGOS; EPENETOS, ANTICANCER RESEARCH, (1999), vol. 19, pages 605 - 614 | - NICULESCU-DUVAZ; SPRINGER, ADV. DRUG DELIV. REV., (1997), vol. 26, pages 151 - 172 | - BALDWIN ET AL., LANCET, (19860315), pages 603 - 05 | - THORPE ET AL., "Antibody Carriers Of Cytotoxic Agents In Cancer Therapy: A Review", THORPE ET AL., A. PINCHERA ET AL.,, Monoclonal Antibodies '84: Biological And Clinical Applications, (1985), pages 475 - 506 | - ROWLAND ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER., (1986), vol. 21, pages 183 - 87 | - MANDLER ET AL., J. NAT. CANCER INST., (2000), vol. 92, no. 19, pages 1573 - 1581 | - MANDLER ET AL., BIOORGANIC & MED. CHEM. LETTERS, (2000), vol. 10, pages 1025 - 1028 | - MANDLER ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (2002), vol. 13, pages 786 - 791 | - LIU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 8618 - 8623 | - LODE ET AL., CANCER RES., (1998), vol. 58, page 2928 | - HINMAN ET AL., CANCER RES., (1993), vol. 53, pages 3336 - 3342 | - WISEMAN ET AL., EUR. JOUR. NUCL. MED., (2000), vol. 27, no. 7, pages 766 - 77 | - WISEMAN ET AL., BLOOD, (2002), vol. 99, no. 12, pages 4336 - 42 | - WITZIG ET AL., J. CLIN. ONCOL., (2002), vol. 20, no. 10, pages 2453 - 63 | - WITZIG ET AL., J. CLIN. ONCOL., (2002), vol. 20, no. 15, pages 3262 - 69 | - DORONINA ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (2003), vol. 21, no. 7, pages 778 - 784 | - VITETTA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 238, page 1098 | - CHARI ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1992), vol. 52, pages 127 - 131 | - CARLSSON ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (1978), vol. 173, pages 723 - 737 | - WOYKE ET AL., ANTIMICROB. AGENTS AND CHEMOTHER., (2001), vol. 45, no. 12, pages 3580 - 3584 | - PETTIT ET AL., ANTIMICROB. AGENTS CHEMOTHER., (1998), vol. 42, pages 2961 - 2965 | - E. SCHRODER; K. LUBKE, The Peptides, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1965), vol. 1, pages 76 - 136 | - PETTIT ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1989), vol. 111, pages 5463 - 5465 | - PETTIT ET AL., ANTI-CANCER DRUG DESIGN, (1998), vol. 13, pages 243 - 277 | - PETTIT, G.R. ET AL., SYNTHESIS, (1996), pages 719 - 725 | - PETTIT ET AL., J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS., (1996), vol. 1, no. 5, pages 859 - 863 | - DORONINA, NAT BIOTECHNOL, (2003), vol. 21, no. 7, pages 778 - 784 | - HINMAN ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 53, pages 3336 - 3342 | - LODE ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1998), vol. 58, pages 2925 - 2928 | - FRAKER ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1978), vol. 80, pages 49 - 57 | - Applications Handbook and Catalog, (2003), pages 467 - 498 | - GEOGHEGAN; STROH, BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1992), vol. 3, pages 138 - 146 | - CHARLTON, Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (2003), vol. 248, pages 245 - 254 | - GERNGROSS, NAT. BIOTECH., (2004), vol. 22, pages 1409 - 1414 | - LI ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH., (2006), vol. 24, pages 210 - 215 | - GRAHAM ET AL., J. GEN VIROL., (1977), vol. 36, page 59 | - MATHER, BIOL. REPROD., (1980), vol. 23, pages 243 - 251 | - MATHER ET AL., ANNALS N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1982), vol. 383, pages 44 - 68 | - URLAUB ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 4216 | - YAZAKI; WU, Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (2003), vol. 248, pages 255 - 268 | - LEE ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL, (2004), vol. 340, pages 1073 - 1093 | - KUAN, C-T ET AL., ENDOCRINE-RELATED CANC., (2001), vol. 8, pages 83 - 96 | - BIGNER, S H ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (1990), vol. 50, pages 8017 - 8022 | - LEET ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 23, no. 340, pages 1073 - 1093 | - LEE ET AL., BLOOD, (2006), vol. 108, pages 3103 - 3111 | - KUNKEL ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 154, pages 367 - 82 | - BOSTROM, J. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 323, pages 1610 - 1614 | - VAJDOS ET AL., J. BIOL. BIOL., (2002), vol. 320, pages 415 - 28 | - SIDHU ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 338, pages 299 - 310 | US20040960602 | US20040983340 |