EP3087915 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR NOISE CLEANING OF PHOTOPLETHYSMOGRAM SIGNALS FOR ESTIMATING BLOOD PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tata Consultancy Services Limited Nirmal Building 9th Floor Nariman Point Mumbai 400 021 Maharashtra / IN | [2016/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANERJEE, Rohan c/oTata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town Rajarhat 700160 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | 02 /
CHOUDHURY, Anirban Dutta c/o Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot IIF/12 New Town Rajarhat 700156 Kolkata - West Bengal / IN | 03 /
SINHA, Aniruddha c/o Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot IIF/12 New Town Rajarhat 700156 Kolkata - West Bengal / IN | 04 /
GHOSE, Avik c/o Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town Rajarhat 700160 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | 05 /
PAL, Arpan c/o Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town, Rajarhat Kolkata - 700160, West Bengal / IN | [2022/06] |
Former [2017/21] | 01 /
BANERJEE, Rohan c/oTata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town Rajarhat 700160 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | ||
02 /
CHOUDHURY, Anirban Dutta c/o Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town Rajarhat 700160 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | |||
03 /
SINHA, Aniruddha c/o Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town Rajarhat 700160 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | |||
04 /
GHOSE, Avik c/o Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town Rajarhat 700160 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | |||
05 /
PAL, Arpan c/o Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town, Rajarhat Kolkata - 700160, West Bengal / IN | |||
Former [2017/19] | 01 /
BANERJEE, Rohan c/oTata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town Rajarhat 700160 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | ||
02 /
CHOUDHURY, Anirban Dutta c/o Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town Rajarhat 700160 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | |||
03 /
SINHA, Aniruddha c/o Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town Rajarhat 700160 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | |||
04 /
GHOSE, Avik c/o Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town Rajarhat 700160 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | |||
05 /
PAL, Arpan c/o Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town Rajarhat 700160 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | |||
Former [2016/50] | 01 /
BANERJEE, Rohan c/oTata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town Rajarhat 700160 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | ||
02 /
CHOUDHURY, Anirban Dutta c/o Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town Rajarhat 700160 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | |||
03 /
SINHA, Aniruddha c/o Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town Rajarhat 700160 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | |||
04 /
GHOSE, Avik c/o Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town Rajarhat 700160 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | |||
05 /
PAL, Arpan c/o Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town Rajarhat 700160 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | |||
Former [2016/44] | 01 /
BANERJEE, Rohan Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town Rajarhat 700156 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | ||
02 /
CHOUDHURY, Anirban Dutta Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town Rajarhat 700156 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | |||
03 /
SINHA, Aniruddha Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town Rajarhat 700156 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | |||
04 /
GHOSE, Avik Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town Rajarhat 700156 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | |||
05 /
PAL, Arpan Tata Consultancy Services Limited Building 1B, Ecospace Plot - IIF/12, New Town Rajarhat 700156 Kolkata, West Bengal / IN | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2022/06] |
Former [2016/44] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16160276.8 | 15.03.2016 | [2016/44] | Priority number, date | IN2015MUM1684 | 27.04.2015 Original published format: IN 1684MU2015 | [2016/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3087915 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3087915 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/021 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
A61B5/02438 (EP,US);
A61B5/02255 (CN);
A61B5/7235 (CN,US);
A61B5/0059 (US);
A61B5/0077 (US);
A61B5/021 (US);
A61B5/02116 (US);
A61B5/14551 (EP,US);
A61B5/6898 (EP,US);
A61B5/72 (CN);
A61B5/7203 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/7225 (CN);
A61B5/7246 (US);
A61B5/7264 (EP,US);
A61B5/7278 (US);
G06T5/20 (US);
G06T5/70 (US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
H04L67/12 (CN);
H04M1/0202 (CN);
H04M1/026 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] |
Former [2016/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR RAUSCHENTFERNUNG VON FOTOPLETHYSMOGRAFISCHEN SIGNALEN FUR BLUTDRUCKSABSCHÄTZUNG | [2016/44] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR NOISE CLEANING OF PHOTOPLETHYSMOGRAM SIGNALS FOR ESTIMATING BLOOD PRESSURE | [2016/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE NETTOYAGE DE BRUIT DE SIGNAUX PHOTOPLÉTHYSMOGRAPHIQUES POUR D'ESTIMATION DE PRESSION DU SANG | [2016/44] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 23.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2016 | AL | 09.02.2022 | AT | 09.02.2022 | CY | 09.02.2022 | CZ | 09.02.2022 | DK | 09.02.2022 | EE | 09.02.2022 | ES | 09.02.2022 | FI | 09.02.2022 | HR | 09.02.2022 | IT | 09.02.2022 | LT | 09.02.2022 | LV | 09.02.2022 | MC | 09.02.2022 | MK | 09.02.2022 | PL | 09.02.2022 | RO | 09.02.2022 | RS | 09.02.2022 | SE | 09.02.2022 | SI | 09.02.2022 | SK | 09.02.2022 | SM | 09.02.2022 | IE | 15.03.2022 | LU | 15.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | BG | 09.05.2022 | NO | 09.05.2022 | GR | 10.05.2022 | IS | 09.06.2022 | PT | 09.06.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 15.03.2016 | |
AL | 09.02.2022 | ||
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CY | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
IE | 15.03.2022 | ||
LU | 15.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 15.03.2016 | |
AL | 09.02.2022 | ||
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
IE | 15.03.2022 | ||
LU | 15.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
IT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
IE | 15.03.2022 | ||
LU | 15.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SI | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
IE | 15.03.2022 | ||
LU | 15.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
IE | 15.03.2022 | ||
LU | 15.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
IE | 15.03.2022 | ||
LU | 15.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 09.02.2022 | |
AT | 09.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
MC | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SK | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
CZ | 09.02.2022 | ||
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
EE | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RO | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
SM | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
DK | 09.02.2022 | ||
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
IS | 09.06.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
FI | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 09.02.2022 | |
ES | 09.02.2022 | ||
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
LV | 09.02.2022 | ||
PL | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
GR | 10.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 09.02.2022 | |
HR | 09.02.2022 | ||
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
RS | 09.02.2022 | ||
SE | 09.02.2022 | ||
BG | 09.05.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 09.02.2022 | |
LT | 09.02.2022 | ||
NO | 09.05.2022 | ||
PT | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 09.02.2022 | |
NO | 09.05.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008275340 (BEACH KIRK [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0056] , [0082] *; | [A]WO2014022906 (CNV SYSTEMS LTD [CA]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] *; | [A]EP2829223 (TATA CONSULTANCY SERVICES LTD [IN]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0039] *; | [Y] - ROHAN BANERJEE ET AL, "Noise cleaning and Gaussian modeling of smart phone photoplethysmogram to improve blood pressure estimation", 2015 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP), (20150419), doi:10.1109/ICASSP.2015.7178113, ISBN 978-1-4673-6997-8, pages 967 - 971, XP055303772 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2015.7178113 | [Y] - SCULLY C G ET AL, "Physiological Parameter Monitoring from Optical Recordings With a Mobile Phone", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20120201), vol. 59, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TBME.2011.2163157, ISSN 0018-9294, pages 303 - 306, XP011408628 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TBME.2011.2163157 |