EP3070566 - PRESSURE-REDUCING VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Azbil Corporation 2-7-3 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6419 / JP | [2016/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUZAWA, Satoshi c/o Azbil Corporation 2-7-3 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 100-6419 / JP | [2016/38] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/38] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16160581.1 | 16.03.2016 | [2016/38] | Priority number, date | JP20150051793 | 16.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015051793 | [2016/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3070566 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G05D16/06 | [2016/38] | CPC: |
G05D16/0663 (EP,US);
F16K17/30 (CN);
G05D16/0633 (US);
F16K1/44 (CN);
F16K31/1264 (CN);
F16K7/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] |
Former [2016/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKMINDERVENTIL | [2016/38] | English: | PRESSURE-REDUCING VALVE | [2016/38] | French: | VALVE RÉDUCTRICE DE PRESSION | [2016/38] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 12.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/29] | 28.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1163404 (CIE IND DES PROCEDES RAOUL PIC) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4055198 (IANNELLI FRANK M) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4171004 (CERRATO VINCENT [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1562303 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]JP2000120896 (NIPPON WALBRO KK) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009302256 (NITTA TOSHINORI [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2012208802 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH0540668U | JPH11311349 | JP2000120896 | JP2007218424 |