EP3070221 - METHOD FOR TREATING THERMAL BRIDGES, ASSOCIATED HEAT-INSULATING ELEMENT AND STRUCTURAL CONNECTION ELEMENT, AND PRE-SLAB PROVIDED WITH SUCH ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KP1 91 Allée des Fenaisons 84000 Avignon / FR | [2022/36] |
Former [2016/38] | For all designated states KP1 135, Avenue Pierre Semard, MIN Bâtiment D 84000 Avignon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAOUR, Thierry 83 Chemin des Saules 30650 Rochefort du Gard / FR | [2023/18] |
Former [2016/38] | 01 /
HAOUR, Thierry 83 Chemin des Saules 30650 ROCHEFORT DU GARD / FR | Representative(s) | Cabinet Boettcher, et al 5, rue de Vienne 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/38] | Decorchemont, Audrey Véronique Christèle, et al CABINET BOETTCHER 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 16160926.8 | 17.03.2016 | [2016/38] | Priority number, date | FR20150052191 | 17.03.2015 Original published format: FR 1552191 | [2016/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3070221 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3070221 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/16, E04B5/32, // E04B1/76 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
E04B5/32 (EP);
E04B1/161 (EP);
E04B2001/7679 (EP);
E04B2005/322 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/38] | E04B5/32, // E04B1/76 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] |
Former [2016/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON WÄRMEBRÜCKEN, ENTSPRECHENDES WÄRMEISOLATIONSELEMENT UND ENTSPRECHENDES STRUKTURELLES VERBINDUNGSELEMENT SOWIE MIT DIESEN ELEMENTEN AUSGERÜSTETE SCHAL-BETONPLATTE | [2016/38] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATING THERMAL BRIDGES, ASSOCIATED HEAT-INSULATING ELEMENT AND STRUCTURAL CONNECTION ELEMENT, AND PRE-SLAB PROVIDED WITH SUCH ELEMENTS | [2016/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE PONTS THERMIQUES, ÉLÉMENT D'ISOLATION THERMIQUE ET ÉLÉMENT DE LIAISON STRUCTURELLE ASSOCIÉS ET PRÉDALLE ÉQUIPÉE DE TELS ÉLÉMENTS | [2016/38] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 16.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2023 | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | FI | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | RS | 03.05.2023 | SE | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | NO | 03.08.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
CZ | 03.05.2023 | ||
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 03.05.2023 | |
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | PT | 04.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0866185 (SCHOECK BAUTEILE GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-22* the whole document *; | [A]FR2887905 (LAFARGE SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]DE202011001710U (OUEST ARMATURES [FR]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [I]EP2706161 (KP1 [FR]) [I] 1-7,10-16,18-21 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1,4,5 * | Examination | FR2854416 | JP2008144407 | FR2951753 | EP2557243 | by applicant | EP0866185 |