EP3069857 - METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF CARBON FIBRE COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/38] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCTION OF CARBON FIBRE COMPONENTS | ||
[2022/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Penso Group Holdings Limited 2 Woodhams Road Coventry, West Midlands CV3 4FX / GB | [2022/47] |
Former [2016/38] | For all designated states Penso Holdings Ltd. 2 Woodhams Road Coventry, West Midlands CV3 4FX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roche, Dave 56 South Avenue Coventry, CV2 4DR / GB | 02 /
Hurcombe, Daniel 66 Finchfiled Road West Wolverhampton, WV3 8BA / GB | 03 /
Thurston-Thorpe, Jevon Crackley Court, 117 Westwood Heath Road Coventry, CV4 8GN / GB | [2016/38] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2023/25] |
Former [2016/38] | Tranter, Andrew David Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16161016.7 | 17.03.2016 | [2016/38] | Priority number, date | GB20150004498 | 17.03.2015 Original published format: GB 201504498 | [2016/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3069857 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3069857 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3069857 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/30, B29B11/16, B29C33/04, B29C33/18, B29C33/46, B29C33/68, B29C70/44, B29C37/00, B29C31/00, // B29L31/30, B29C35/16, B29L31/00 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
B29B11/16 (EP,GB,US);
B29C70/541 (GB);
B29C31/008 (EP,US);
B29C33/04 (EP,US);
B29C33/18 (EP,GB,US);
B29C33/46 (EP,GB,US);
B29C35/16 (US);
B29C37/0075 (EP,US);
B29C70/30 (EP,GB,US);
B29C70/44 (EP,US);
B29C2035/1616 (EP,US);
B29C2791/006 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/41] | B29C70/30, B29B11/16, B29C33/04, B29C33/18, B29C33/46, B29C33/68, B29C70/44, B29C37/00, B29C31/00, // B29L31/30 | ||
Former IPC [2016/38] | B29C70/30, B29B11/16, B29C33/04, B29C33/18, B29C33/46, B29C33/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] |
Former [2016/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CARBONFASERKOMPONENTEN | [2022/36] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF CARBON FIBRE COMPONENTS | [2022/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE COMPOSANTS DE FIBRE DE CARBONE | [2022/36] |
Former [2016/38] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CARBONFASERKOMPONENTEN | ||
Former [2016/38] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCTION OF CARBON FIBRE COMPONENTS | ||
Former [2016/38] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION DE COMPOSANTS DE FIBRE DE CARBONE | Examination procedure | 17.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 05.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2023 | CZ | 21.06.2023 | DK | 21.06.2023 | EE | 21.06.2023 | ES | 21.06.2023 | FI | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | IT | 21.06.2023 | LT | 21.06.2023 | LV | 21.06.2023 | NL | 21.06.2023 | PL | 21.06.2023 | RO | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SE | 21.06.2023 | SI | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | PT | 23.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04193507 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1,2,5,6,9* abstract *; | [X]US5451157 (GIMENEZ CARLOS M [AR]) [X] 10-13 * column 5, line 7 - line 35 * * column 5, line 44 - line 51; figure 3.4.6 *; | [Y]EP0933182 (LEBMEIER RAINER DIPL ING [DE]) [Y] 2,5,6,9 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 5 * * column 4, lines 2-8 * * column 4, lines 24-35 * * paragraph [0013]; figures 3,4 *; | [XYI]US2012279649 (LEMCKAU THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,10-12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0019] , [0020] , [0023] , [0024]; figure - * [Y] 2,5,6,9 [I] 8 |