EP3056589 - PHOTOELECTRODE MATERIAL AND PHOTOCELL MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Frontier Technology Laboratory Inc. Kyodo Tsushin Building 2-5 Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | [2016/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komatsu, Nobuaki 6-10 Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | 02 /
Ito, Tomoko 804, 55-4 Nakajuku Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 173-0005 / JP | 03 /
Nanjo, Shin-ichiro B610, 27 Nakadai 3-chome Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 174-0064 / JP | 04 /
Nagai, Hiroki 501, 38-4 Tera-machi Hachiouji-shi, Tokyo 192-0073 / JP | [2016/33] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [2016/33] | Application number, filing date | 16161955.6 | 21.10.2010 | [2016/33] | Priority number, date | JP20090242432 | 21.10.2009 Original published format: JP 2009242432 | JP20100088571 | 07.04.2010 Original published format: JP 2010088571 | JP20100206914 | 15.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010206914 | JP20100229129 | 08.10.2010 Original published format: JP 2010229129 | [2016/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3056589 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3056589 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C25B11/06, H01L31/04, H01M14/00, // C25B11/04, C25B1/00 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
H01M14/005 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C25B11/077 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C25B1/55 (EP,CN,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] |
Former [2016/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PHOTOELEKTRODENMATERIAL UND PHOTOZELLENMATERIAL | [2016/33] | English: | PHOTOELECTRODE MATERIAL AND PHOTOCELL MATERIAL | [2016/33] | French: | MATÉRIAU DE PHOTO-ÉLECTRODE ET DE PHOTOCELLULE | [2016/33] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 23.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10825005.1 / EP2492375 | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.10.2010 | AL | 02.10.2019 | AT | 02.10.2019 | CY | 02.10.2019 | CZ | 02.10.2019 | HR | 02.10.2019 | LV | 02.10.2019 | MC | 02.10.2019 | MK | 02.10.2019 | MT | 02.10.2019 | RO | 02.10.2019 | RS | 02.10.2019 | SI | 02.10.2019 | SK | 02.10.2019 | SM | 02.10.2019 | TR | 02.10.2019 | LU | 21.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | BG | 02.01.2020 | GR | 03.01.2020 | IS | 02.02.2020 | PT | 03.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 21.10.2010 | |
AL | 02.10.2019 | ||
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CY | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
MT | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
TR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 21.10.2010 | |
AL | 02.10.2019 | ||
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CY | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
MT | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 21.10.2010 | |
AL | 02.10.2019 | ||
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CY | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CY | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
LU | 21.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | BG | 02.01.2020 | |
PT | 03.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5672444 (KURIYAKI HISAO [JP], et al) [X] 1,7-9 * col. 1, l. 14-16 * col. 2, l. 60-67 * [I] 4-6; | [YD]JP2004290747 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL, et al) [YD] 3 * paragraphs [0011] - [0012] *; | [Y]US2007042902 (YAZAWA TETSUO [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 11] , [0 10] - paragraph [0011] *; | [Y] - ROEL VAN DE KROL ET AL, "Solar hydrogen production with nanostructured metal oxides", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY, (20080101), vol. 18, no. 20, doi:10.1039/b718969a, ISSN 0959-9428, page 2311, XP055124904 [Y] 2,3 * p. 2317, right hand column * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b718969a | by applicant | JP2004290748 | JP2004290747 | WO2005089941 | WO2006095916 |