EP3222849 - COOLING, DE-ICING AND CLEANING METHOD FOR A WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nielsen, Morten Bay Bülowsgade 37,3 8000 Aarhus / DK | 02 /
Soerensen, Carsten Moeller Herningvej 68 7260 Sdr. Omme / DK | [2017/39] | Application number, filing date | 16162137.0 | 24.03.2016 | [2017/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3222849 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F03D80/55, F03D80/40, F03D80/60 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
F03D80/60 (EP);
F03D80/40 (EP);
F03D80/55 (EP);
F05B2210/404 (EP);
F05B2260/20 (EP);
F05B2260/63 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜHLUNGS-, ENTEISUNGS- UND REINIGUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE WINDTURBINE | [2017/39] | English: | COOLING, DE-ICING AND CLEANING METHOD FOR A WIND TURBINE | [2017/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE REFROIDISSEMENT, DE DÉGIVRAGE ET DE NETTOYAGE POUR UNE ÉOLIENNE | [2017/39] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/47] | 28.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2466128 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,10,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0042] * * figure - * [I] 3-9,12; | [A]EP2320071 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0042] * * figure - *; | [A]US2010164228 (MATSUO TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0111] * * figure - * |