EP3222736 - HYDROTHERMAL PROCESS FOR THE TREATMENT OF LEAD GLASS WITH RECOVERY OF LEAD METAL, SOLUBLE AND INSOLUBLE SILICATES AND SILICA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hellatron S.r.l. in liquidazione Via Monte Rosa, 21 20149 Milano / IT | [2019/32] |
Former [2017/39] | For all designated states Hellatron S.p.A. Via Alberto Mario, 65 20149 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Modica, Giovanni Via G.B. Brocchi 24 20157 Milano / IT | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | Palladino, Saverio Massimo, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/39] | Palladino, Saverio Massimo, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 16162266.7 | 24.03.2016 | [2017/39] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3222736 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3222736 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C22B7/00, C22B3/00, H01J9/52 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
C22B13/045 (EP);
C22B7/008 (EP);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] |
Former [2017/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HYDROTHERMALEN BEHANDLUNG VON BLEIGLAS MIT RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON BLEIMETALL, LÖSLICHER UND UNLÖSLICHER SILIKATE UND KIESELSÄURE | [2017/39] | English: | HYDROTHERMAL PROCESS FOR THE TREATMENT OF LEAD GLASS WITH RECOVERY OF LEAD METAL, SOLUBLE AND INSOLUBLE SILICATES AND SILICA | [2017/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ HYDROTHERMAL POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU VERRE AU PLOMB AVEC RÉCUPÉRATION DU PLOMB MÉTAL, DE SILICATES SOLUBLES ET INSOLUBLES ET DE LA SILICE | [2017/39] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 28.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2018 | 31.03.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2016 | AL | 06.11.2019 | CY | 06.11.2019 | CZ | 06.11.2019 | EE | 06.11.2019 | FI | 06.11.2019 | HR | 06.11.2019 | LT | 06.11.2019 | LV | 06.11.2019 | MC | 06.11.2019 | MK | 06.11.2019 | MT | 06.11.2019 | RS | 06.11.2019 | SI | 06.11.2019 | SK | 06.11.2019 | SM | 06.11.2019 | TR | 06.11.2019 | BG | 06.02.2020 | NO | 06.02.2020 | IS | 06.03.2020 | PT | 06.03.2020 | LU | 24.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 24.03.2016 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
MT | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
TR | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
LU | 24.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
LU | 24.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
LU | 24.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 06.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]CH680837 (DRISA POLYTECHNIK AG) [I] 1-6,8-10 * abstract * * page 2, column 1, lines 10-20 * * claims 1,2,8 * [A] 7; | [AD]EP2455500 (COSTECH INTERNAT S P A [IT]) [AD] 1* claims 1-4,7 *; | [IA] - CHENGLONG ZHANG ET AL, "Recovering lead from cathode ray tube funnel glass by mechano-chemical extraction in alkaline solution", WASTE MANAGEMENT AND RESEARCH, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, US, (20130701), vol. 31, no. 7, doi:10.1177/0734242X13484188, ISSN 0734-242X, pages 759 - 763, XP009174850 [I] 1-6,8-10 * abstract * * page 760, column 2 * * page 762, column 1 - page 763, column 1 * [A] 7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/0734242X13484188 | by applicant | EP2455500 | - H. MIYOSHI ET AL., "A novel process utilizing subcritical water to remove lead from wasted lead silicate glass", CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (2004), vol. 33, no. 8, page 956 | - RYO SASAI ET AL., "Development of an ecofriendly material recycling process for spent lead glass using a mechanochemical process and Na EDTA reagent", ENVIRON. SCI. TECHNOL., (2008), vol. 42, no. 11, pages 4159 - 4164 | - P.G. YOT ET AL., "Lead extraction from waste funnel cathode-ray tubes glasses by reaction with silicon carbide and titanium nitride", JOURNAL OF HAZARDOUS MATERIALS, (2009), vol. 172, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jhazmat.2009.06.137, pages 117 - 123, XP027594585 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jhazmat.2009.06.137 |