EP3222869 - TORQUE LIMITING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodrich Actuation Systems Limited Fore 1, Fore Business Park Huskisson Way Stratford Road Shirley Solihull, West Midlands B90 4SS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/39] | For all designated states Goodrich Actuation Systems Limited Fore 1, Fore Business Park Huskisson Way Stratford Road Shirley, Solihull West Midlands B90 4SS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIES, Stephen 3 Tower Farm Uffington Shrewsbury, Shropshire SY4 4SF / GB | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/19] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2017/39] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16162452.3 | 24.03.2016 | [2017/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3222869 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3222869 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16D47/02, F16D3/72, F16D43/02, F16D47/04, F16D41/02, F16D41/067 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
B64C13/50 (EP,BR,RU,US);
B64C9/24 (BR,RU,US);
F16D3/10 (BR,RU,US);
F16D3/72 (EP,RU,US);
F16D41/02 (EP,RU,US);
F16D41/067 (EP,RU,US);
F16D43/02 (EP,RU,US);
F16D47/02 (EP,RU,US);
F16D47/04 (EP,RU,US);
Y02T50/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] |
Former [2017/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DREHMOMENTBEGRENZUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/39] | English: | TORQUE LIMITING DEVICE | [2017/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LIMITATION DE COUPLE | [2017/39] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 09.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.11.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 21.11.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.11.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.07.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 09.07.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.07.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2016 | AL | 06.05.2020 | AT | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | ES | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | IT | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MK | 06.05.2020 | MT | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | RS | 06.05.2020 | SE | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | IS | 06.09.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 24.03.2016 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
MK | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 24.03.2016 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 24.03.2016 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS61124725U (FUJI XEROX) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014232225 (HEINZE SEBASTIAN [DE], et al) [A] 6* the whole document *; | [A]CN104110444 (LANZHOU NO 2 CONSTRUCTION GROUP JIANXIN ENGINEERING CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP2889504 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,6-10,14,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0006] , [0008] , [0009] , [0012] , [0028] * * figure 1 *; | [Y] - Abssac, "Torsion Springs | ABSSAC", (20150102), URL: http://www.abssac.co.uk/p/Torsion+Springs/125/#.WByu-XrdfSi, (20161104), XP055316776 [Y] 1-5,11-13 * the whole document * | Examination | US2016016653 |