EP3061413 - TISSUE CLIPPING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | [2016/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Menn, Dimitri 153 Algonquin Tr. Ashland, Massachusetts 01721 / US | 02 /
Durgin, Russell F. 146 Knott Street Attleboro, Massachusetts 02703 / US | 03 /
Wells, Brian Keith 2800 Bittersweet Lane Lagrange, Kentucky 2800 / US | 04 /
Wolf, Lance Alan 4160 Andrew Drive Floyds Knobs, Indiana 47119 / US | 05 /
Furnish, Gregory R. 2614 Top Hill Road Louisville, Kentucky 40206 / US | 06 /
Abramov, Vasiliy P. 2356 Page Avenue Louisville, Kentucky 40205 / US | 07 /
Kelly, William C. Mers 5420 Foxwood Drive Crestwood, Kentucky 40014 / US | [2016/35] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/35] | Application number, filing date | 16162551.2 | 16.06.2009 | [2016/35] | Priority number, date | US20080074094P | 19.06.2008 Original published format: US 74094 P | [2016/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3061413 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3061413 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/122, A61B17/128, A61B90/00 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
A61B17/1285 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/122 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/00234 (US);
A61B17/083 (US);
A61B17/10 (US);
A61B2017/00778 (US);
A61B2090/037 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/35] | A61B17/122, A61B17/128 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/35] | Title | German: | GEWEBEKLEMMVORRICHTUNG | [2016/35] | English: | TISSUE CLIPPING APPARATUS | [2016/35] | French: | APPAREIL DE FIXATION TISSULAIRE | [2016/35] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 28.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09767595.3 / EP2288296 | EP13156368.6 / EP2630923 | EP14185123.8 / EP2823776 | Divisional application(s) | EP21215962.8 / EP4023171 | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.06.2009 | AT | 19.01.2022 | CY | 19.01.2022 | CZ | 19.01.2022 | DK | 19.01.2022 | EE | 19.01.2022 | ES | 19.01.2022 | FI | 19.01.2022 | HR | 19.01.2022 | IT | 19.01.2022 | LT | 19.01.2022 | LV | 19.01.2022 | MC | 19.01.2022 | PL | 19.01.2022 | RO | 19.01.2022 | SE | 19.01.2022 | SI | 19.01.2022 | SK | 19.01.2022 | BG | 19.04.2022 | NO | 19.04.2022 | GR | 20.04.2022 | IS | 19.05.2022 | PT | 19.05.2022 | LU | 16.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | FR | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 16.06.2009 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
IT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
IT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
FR | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
LU | 16.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 19.01.2022 | |
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 19.01.2022 | |
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 19.01.2022 | |
NO | 19.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10203956 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0106] - [0123]; figures 12-14 *; | [A]WO03030746 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 7, line 21 - page 10, line 26; figures 1-4,14 * * figures 1-6 *; | [I]US2005080440 (DURGIN RUSSELL F [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0055] , [0066]; figures 9,10,12,18 * * figure - * | by applicant | US20070915806 |