EP3226430 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF CENTRALLY MANAGING A WIRELESS POWER OUTLET FOR POWERING ELECTRICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Powermat Technologies Ltd. Kiryat Hatikshoret 90850 Neve Ilan / IL | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEN HANOCH, Rachel 41 Hanassi St. 54021 Givat Shmuel / IL | 02 /
PODKAMIEN, Ian 6 Ben Hur St. 49063 Petach Tikva / IL | 03 /
KIESEL, Amit 10A Gat St. 9610317 Jerusalem / IL | 04 /
SALHUV, Amir 17 Haachim Treves 7648841 Rehovot / IL | 05 /
KOREN, Yuval 7 Max Shaine St. 76666 Rehovot / IL | 06 /
RAVEH, Guy 262 Hazait St. 99870 Mataa / IL | 07 /
OZ, Ami 10 Katsanelson St. 5801605 Azor / IL | 08 /
GREENWALD, Oola 107 HaShalom St. 90805 Mevasseret Zion / IL | 09 /
GLUZMAN, Ilya 3 Greenberg St. 58670 Holon / IL | 10 /
MACH, Elieser - 90938 Rosh Tzurim / IL | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Denninger Str. 169 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Cuvilliésstraße 14 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16162627.0 | 29.03.2016 | [2017/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3226430 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04B5/00, H02J5/00, H02J7/02, H02J50/00 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
H04B5/79 (EP,US);
H02J50/10 (EP,US);
H02J50/80 (EP,US);
H02J7/00034 (EP,US);
H04B5/266 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZENTRALEN VERWALTUNG EINER DRAHTLOSEN STECKDOSE ZUR VERSORGUNG ELEKTRISCHER VORRICHTUNGEN | [2017/40] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF CENTRALLY MANAGING A WIRELESS POWER OUTLET FOR POWERING ELECTRICAL DEVICES | [2017/40] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE GÉRER CENTRALEMENT UNE SORTIE DE PUISSANCE SANS FIL POUR ALIMENTER DES DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRIQUES | [2017/40] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/39] | 14.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016006264 (ALPERIN EDUARDO [IL], et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [XI]WO2016020645 (CHARGIFI LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * page 4, lines 24,25, 17-31, 35-37; figure 1 * * page 7, lines 14-16,1-2,31-33 * * page 5, lines 11, 1,2 * * page 6, lines 14-36 * * page 10, lines 15-17,27-29 * * page 9, lines 23-30 * * page 1, lines 24-26 * * page 14, lines 32-37 * * page 2, lines 6-12 * [I] 4,5,8-11 | by applicant | WO2014IL50203 |