EP3079074 - DATA-PROCESSING METHOD FOR ESTIMATING PARAMETERS FOR MIXING AUDIO SIGNALS, ASSOCIATED MIXING METHOD, DEVICES AND COMPUTER PROGRAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B<>COM 1219 avenue des Champs Blancs 35510 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [2018/49] |
Former [2016/41] | For all designated states B<>COM 1219 avenue des Champs Blancs 35510 Cesson Sevigne / FR | ||
For all designated states Orange 78, rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEDOSOV, Andrey 91 A rue de Dinan Appt 14 35000 Rennes / FR | 02 /
DANIEL, Jerome 4 rue des Agapanthes 22710 Penvenan / FR | 03 /
PALLONE, Gregory 25 boulevard Jacques Cartier 35000 Rennes / FR | [2024/04] |
Former [2016/41] | 01 /
FEDOSOV, Andrey 91 A rue de Dinan Appt 14 35000 Rennes / FR | ||
02 /
DANIEL, Jerome 4 rue des Agapanthes 22710 Penvenan / FR | |||
03 /
PALLONE, Gregory 25 boulevard Jacques Cartier 35ooo Rennes / FR | Representative(s) | Ermeneux, Bertrand AVOXA 5 allée Ermengarde d'Anjou ZAC Atalante Champeaux CS 40824 35108 Rennes / FR | [2016/41] | Application number, filing date | 16163473.8 | 01.04.2016 | [2016/41] | Priority number, date | FR20150053164 | 10.04.2015 Original published format: FR 1553164 | FR20150057214 | 28.07.2015 Original published format: FR 1557214 | [2016/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3079074 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04R3/00, G06F17/15, G10L19/008, H04R29/00, H04R5/027, H04S3/00, H04S7/00 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H04R3/005 (EP,US);
G06F17/15 (EP,US);
G10L19/008 (EP,US);
H04R2430/20 (EP,US);
H04R29/005 (EP,US);
H04R5/027 (EP,US);
H04S2400/15 (EP,US);
H04S2420/11 (EP,US);
H04S3/008 (EP,US);
H04S7/301 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/41] | G06F17/15, G10L19/008, H04R29/00, H04S3/00, H04S5/00, H04S7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] |
Former [2016/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR EINSCHÄTZUNG DER PARAMETER FÜR DIE AUDIOSIGNALMISCHUNG, ENTSPRECHENDES MISCHVERFAHREN, ENTSPRECHENDE VORRICHTUNGEN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMME | [2016/41] | English: | DATA-PROCESSING METHOD FOR ESTIMATING PARAMETERS FOR MIXING AUDIO SIGNALS, ASSOCIATED MIXING METHOD, DEVICES AND COMPUTER PROGRAMS | [2016/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES POUR L'ESTIMATION DE PARAMÈTRES DE MIXAGE DE SIGNAUX AUDIO, PROCÉDÉ DE MIXAGE, DISPOSITIFS, ET PROGRAMMES D'ORDINATEURS ASSOCIÉS | [2016/41] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 06.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/40] | 27.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012105885 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [I]WO2014204999 (DOLBY LAB LICENSING CORP [US]) [I] 1-19 * paragraphes [0007], [0037], [0045], [0046] et [0055] *; | [A] - JÖRN NETTINGSMEIER, "Field Report: A pop production in Ambisonics", PROCEEDINGS OF THE LINUX AUDIO CONFERENCE 2010, Utrecht, The Netherlands, (201005), pages 1 - 7, XP055253324 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | [A] - MATTHIAS FRANK ET AL, "Producing 3D Audio in Ambisonics", AES 57TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, Hollywood, USA, (20150306), pages 1 - 8, XP055253306 [A] 1-19 * section 3.1 * | [A] - CHRIS BAUME ET AL, "SCALING NEW HEIGHTS IN BROADCASTING USING AMBISONICS", PROC. OF THE 2ND INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON AMBISONICS AND SPHERICAL ACOUSTICS, Paris, France, (20100506), pages 1 - 9, XP055253314 [A] 1-19 * section 3.3 * | [A] - KEARNEY GAVIN ET AL, "Virtual Vs. Actual Multichannel Acoustical Recording", AES CONVENTION 124; MAY 2008, AES, 60 EAST 42ND STREET, ROOM 2520 NEW YORK 10165-2520, USA, (200805), XP040508542 [A] 1-19 * section 5.2 * | by applicant | - M. A. GERZON, "Periphony: With-Height Sound Reproduction", J. AUDIO ENG. SOC., (197302), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 2 - 10 | - R.W. SCHAFER ET AL., "A Digital Signal Processing Approach to Interpolation", PROCEEDINGS IEEE, (197306), vol. 61, no. 6, pages 692 - 702 |