EP3112542 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR HEAT DECOUPLING OF CONCRETED PARTS OF BUILDINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHÖCK BAUTEILE GmbH Vimbucher Strasse 2 76534 Baden-Baden / DE | [2017/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2017/01] | Representative(s) | LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/18] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2017/01] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bismarckstraße 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 16164249.1 | 07.04.2016 | [2017/01] | Priority number, date | DE201510106294 | 23.04.2015 Original published format: DE102015106294 | [2017/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3112542 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3112542 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/16, E04B1/78, // E04B1/76, E04C3/34, E04C5/06 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
E04C3/34 (EP,US);
E04B1/41 (US);
E04B1/165 (EP,US);
E04B1/76 (US);
E04B1/78 (EP,US);
E04C5/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/29] |
Former [2017/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR WÄRMEENTKOPPLUNG VON BETONIERTEN GEBÄUDETEILEN | [2017/01] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR HEAT DECOUPLING OF CONCRETED PARTS OF BUILDINGS | [2017/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE COUPLAGE THERMIQUE DE PARTIES BETONNEES DE BATIMENT | [2017/01] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/29] | 04.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20164907.6 / EP3690159 | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | ES | 29.04.2020 | GR | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | MK | 29.04.2020 | MT | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | TR | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MK | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
TR | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MK | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | HR | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | HR | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | HR | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0745733 (SFS HANDELS HOLDING AG [CH]) [I] 2,8* column 1, line 3 - column 8, line 25; figures 1-7 *; | [A]DE202005019077U (NOLASOFT INGENIEURGEMEINSCHAFT [DE]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1-9 *; | [XDI]EP2405065 (KOCH GEORG [DE]) [XD] 1,6-8,10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0040]; figures 5-11 * [I] 2-5,9,11,12 | by applicant | DE10106222 | EP2405065 |