EP3228778 - FORMWORK GIRDER AND FORMWORK STRUCTURE WITH SUCH A FORMWORK GIRDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOKA GmbH Josef Umdasch Platz 1 3300 Amstetten / AT | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/41] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 16164410.9 | 08.04.2016 | [2017/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3228778 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E04G11/50, E04G17/02, E04C3/12, E04C3/18, E04B1/26 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
E04G11/50 (EP);
E04G17/02 (EP);
E04C3/12 (EP);
E04C3/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] |
Former [2017/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALUNGSTRÄGER UND SCHALUNGSKONSTRUKTION MIT EINEM SOLCHEN SCHALUNGSTRÄGER | [2017/41] | English: | FORMWORK GIRDER AND FORMWORK STRUCTURE WITH SUCH A FORMWORK GIRDER | [2017/41] | French: | SUPPORT DE COFFRAGE ET CONSTRUCTION DE COFFRAGE COMPRENANT UN TEL SUPPORT DE COFFRAGE | [2017/41] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 23.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/21] | 17.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2016116532 (DOKA GMBH [AT]) [E] 1,11-15 * page 8, paragraph 2; figures 1-24; claims 1,5 *; | [IA]EP0667426 (TIMMERMANN FRIEDRICH [DE]) [I] 1-4,8,13,15 * figures 1-10; claim 1 * [A] 5-7,9,10,14; | [A]WO8502878 (ERICSSON ROGER) [A] 11,12 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2373654 (ALLOMBERT GEORGES [FR]) [A] 11,12 * figures 1-3 *; | [AD]EP2141307 (DOKA IND GMBH [AT]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP2309077 (PERI GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]US2002020799 (MCSWAIN GREGORY A [US]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4070845 (CODY DAVID L) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2141307 | EP2309077 | DE10359761 | DE9010140U | DE3240671 | US2002020799 |