EP3081257 - ACTIVE IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE FOR CARDIAC STIMULATION COMPRISING MEANS FOR DETECTING A REMODELLING OR REVERSE REMODELLING PHENOMENON OF THE PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.06.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sorin CRM SAS Parc d'Affaires NOVEOS 4, Avenue Réaumur 92140 Clamart Cedex / FR | [2017/43] |
Former [2016/42] | For all designated states Sorin CRM SAS Parc d'Affaires NOVEOS 4, Avenue Réaumur 92140 Clamart Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EUZEN, Marie-Anne SORIN CRM SAS 4, allée du Rouge-Gorge 91570 Bièvres / FR | 02 /
MILPIED, Paola SORIN CRM SAS 134 avenue du Général Leclerc 75014 Paris / FR | [2016/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/43] |
Former [2016/42] | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique Bardehle Pagenberg 10, boulevard Haussmann 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 16164525.4 | 08.04.2016 | [2016/42] | Priority number, date | FR20150053421 | 17.04.2015 Original published format: FR 1553421 | [2016/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3081257 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3081257 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/362, A61B5/00, A61B5/04, A61N1/39, A61N1/365 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
A61N1/3627 (EP,US);
A61B5/316 (US);
A61B5/318 (US);
A61B5/341 (EP,US);
A61B5/686 (EP,US);
A61N1/0563 (US);
A61N1/365 (EP,US);
A61N1/36842 (EP,US);
A61N1/36843 (EP,US);
A61N1/3702 (US);
A61N1/3925 (US);
A61N1/39622 (EP,US);
A61B5/283 (EP,US);
A61B5/361 (EP,US);
A61B5/7246 (EP,US);
A61B5/7275 (EP,US);
A61B5/746 (EP,US);
A61N1/3682 (EP,US);
A61N1/3684 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] |
Former [2016/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AKTIVE IMPLANTIERBARE MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERZSTIMULATION, DIE DETEKTIONSMITTEL FÜR REMODELLIERUNGSERSCHEINUNGEN ODER INVERSEN REMODELLIERUNGSERSCHEINUNGEN DES PATIENTEN UMFASST | [2016/42] | English: | ACTIVE IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE FOR CARDIAC STIMULATION COMPRISING MEANS FOR DETECTING A REMODELLING OR REVERSE REMODELLING PHENOMENON OF THE PATIENT | [2016/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL IMPLANTABLE ACTIF DE STIMULATION CARDIAQUE COMPRENANT DES MOYENS DE DÉTECTION D'UN PHÉNOMÈNE DE REMODELAGE OU REMODELAGE INVERSE DU PATIENT | [2016/42] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/22] | 02.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.04.2016 | AL | 25.10.2017 | AT | 25.10.2017 | CY | 25.10.2017 | CZ | 25.10.2017 | DK | 25.10.2017 | EE | 25.10.2017 | ES | 25.10.2017 | FI | 25.10.2017 | HR | 25.10.2017 | LT | 25.10.2017 | LV | 25.10.2017 | MC | 25.10.2017 | MK | 25.10.2017 | MT | 25.10.2017 | NL | 25.10.2017 | PL | 25.10.2017 | PT | 25.10.2017 | RO | 25.10.2017 | RS | 25.10.2017 | SE | 25.10.2017 | SI | 25.10.2017 | SK | 25.10.2017 | SM | 25.10.2017 | TR | 25.10.2017 | BG | 25.01.2018 | NO | 25.01.2018 | GR | 26.01.2018 | IS | 25.02.2018 | IE | 08.04.2018 | LU | 08.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 08.04.2016 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
IE | 08.04.2018 | ||
LU | 08.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 08.04.2016 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
IE | 08.04.2018 | ||
LU | 08.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
IE | 08.04.2018 | ||
LU | 08.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
IE | 08.04.2018 | ||
LU | 08.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
IE | 08.04.2018 | ||
LU | 08.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 08.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 08.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 25.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2010249626 (EL ARAB JINANE [FR], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0054] - [0084] - [0104] - [0108]; figures 1,3-4; claim 1 * [A] 10 [Y] 11,12; | [XAY]US2011118804 (HENRY CHRISTINE [FR], et al) [X] 1-9 * claims 1-15 * * paragraph [0049] * [A] 10 [Y] 11,12; | [YA]US2011230776 (MILPIED PAOLA [US], et al) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0005]; claim 1 * [A] 10; | [YA]US2014172037 (EUZEN MARIE-ANNE [FR], et al) [Y] 12 * figure 1 * [A] 10; | [A]US2007191901 (SCHECTER STUART O [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011118803 (HOU WENBO [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1108446 | US2011152660 | US2007239037 | US2007043394 | US2009270747 | US7996070 | EP2105843 | EP2324885 | EP2368493 | EP2742971 | EP2742973 | - MILPIED ET AL., "Arrhythmia Dis crimination in Implantable Cardioverter Defibrillators using Support Vector Machines applied to a new Représentation of Electrograms", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, (201106), vol. 58, no. 6, pages 1797 - 1803 |