EP3067193 - TILING PRODUCTION FOR A PAIR OF BOXES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Packsize LLC 3760 West Smart Pack Way Salt Lake City, UT 84104 / US | [2018/27] |
Former [2016/37] | For all designated states Packsize LLC 6440 South Wasatch Boulevard Salt Lake City, UT 84121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETTERSSON, Niklas c/o Packsize LLC 6440 Wasatch Boulevard, Suite 305 Salt Lake City, UT Utah 84121 / US | 02 /
OSTERHOUT, Ryan 2880 West 3825 South West Haven, UT Utah 84401 / US | [2016/37] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/37] | Application number, filing date | 16164847.2 | 20.07.2012 | [2016/37] | Priority number, date | US201161510894P | 22.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161510894 P | [2016/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3067193 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3067193 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B31B50/00 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
B65B5/024 (EP,BR,US);
B65B5/02 (EP,BR);
B65B57/00 (EP,BR);
B65B65/00 (EP,BR);
B65B65/006 (EP,BR);
B31B2100/00 (EP,BR,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/37] | B31B1/00, B65B5/02, B65B5/00, B65B65/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] | Title | German: | PARALLELE HERSTELLUNG EINES SCHACHTELPAARES | [2016/37] | English: | TILING PRODUCTION FOR A PAIR OF BOXES | [2016/37] | French: | PRODUCTION EN PARALLÈLLE D'UNE PAIRE DE CARTONS D'EMBALLAGE | [2016/37] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/37] | 13.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12817203.8 / EP2734359 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.01.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 10.01.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.01.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3280531 (GUNTHER MEYER-JAGENBERG); | [A]US7100811 (PETTERSSON NIKLAS [SE], et al); | [A]US2008020916 (MAGNELL GREG [US]); | [XPA]WO2012006050 (PACKSIZE LLC [US], et al) | Examination | JP2010201909 |