EP3082011 - ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR MEASURING AND CONTROLLING THE HEATING TEMPERATURE IN ONE SEMI-CONDUCTOR GAS SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zentrum Mikroelektronik Dresden AG Grenzstrasse 28 01109 Dresden / DE | [2016/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEORGI, Michael Niedere Straße 17c 01705 Freital / DE | 02 /
SCHREIBER, Ronald Schöne Aussicht 12 01705 Freital / DE | [2016/42] | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/42] | Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 16165261.5 | 14.04.2016 | [2016/42] | Priority number, date | DE201510105871 | 17.04.2015 Original published format: DE102015105871 | [2016/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3082011 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/19, G01N27/12, // G05D23/24 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
G01N27/123 (EP,CN,US);
G01N27/4143 (KR);
G01N27/125 (US);
G05D23/1951 (EP,US);
G05D23/2401 (EP,US);
H01L23/34 (US);
G01N2021/786 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] |
Former [2016/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG UND STEUERUNG DER HEIZTEMPERATUR IN EINEM HALBLEITER-GASSENSOR | [2016/42] | English: | ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR MEASURING AND CONTROLLING THE HEATING TEMPERATURE IN ONE SEMI-CONDUCTOR GAS SENSOR | [2016/42] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE MESURE ET DE COMMANDE DE LA TEMPERATURE DE CHAUFFAGE DANS UN CAPTEUR DE GAZ A SEMI-CONDUCTEURS | [2016/42] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/22] | 09.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004086023 (SMITH JAMES CRAIG [US], et al) [Y] 8* paragraphs [0015] - [0017] *; | [X]US2008234875 (NOMURA MASATOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0013] - [0017] - [0 43] , [0 54] , [0 65] - [0069] - [0 76] , [0 83] - [0084] *; | [XY]US2009039073 (GUO MIN [CN], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0004] , [00 6] , [0 11] , [0 14] - [0018] - [0 20] , [0 31] - [0035]; figures 1, 2 * [Y] 8,9; | [X]US2009060795 (OWEN GREGORY H [US], et al) [X] 4,8 * paragraphs [0021] - [0026] *; | [Y]DE102012204899 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 8,9 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 27] - [0030] *; | [XI]US8596108 (BRISTOL L RODNEY [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, lines 49-56 * * column 5, lines 8-26, 35-36 * * column 4, lines 43-46, 56-61 * * column 3, lines 62-63 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 8 * * column 6, lines 41-43 * [I] 4-9 |