EP3086156 - LASER SCANNING MICROSCOPE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAKARA, Koji c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
OTSUKA, Yoichi c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
KYOGAKU, Masafumi c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
HASHIMOTO, Hiroyuki c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Foxon, Rachel Siobhan Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [2016/43] | Application number, filing date | 16165808.3 | 18.04.2016 | [2016/43] | Priority number, date | JP20150086266 | 20.04.2015 Original published format: JP 2015086266 | JP20160020932 | 05.02.2016 Original published format: JP 2016020932 | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3086156 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/00 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
G02B21/0036 (EP,US);
G02B21/008 (US);
G01N21/6428 (US);
G01N21/6458 (US);
G01N21/65 (US);
G02B21/0032 (US);
G02B21/0064 (US);
G02B21/0076 (EP,US);
G01N2021/655 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LASERSCAN-MIKROSKOPVORRICHTUNG | [2016/43] | English: | LASER SCANNING MICROSCOPE APPARATUS | [2016/43] | French: | MICROSCOPE À BALAYAGE LASER | [2016/43] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1895347 (UNIV ZUERICH [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,13 * the whole document * [I] 8-10; | [X]WO2009129802 (NANOLIT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1* abstract *; | [XI]US2011296562 (BEAUREPAIRE EMMANUEL JEAN-MARC [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,11-13 * the whole document * [I] 4,7-10; | [X]WO2014115341 (TAKAOKA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH09281405 |