EP3236363 - CONTENT SEARCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2017/43] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERONEN, Antti Johannes Rintamäenkatu 13 A 6 33820 Tampere / FI | 02 /
LEHTINIEMI, Arto Juhani Lomarantatie 17 33880 Lempäälä / FI | 03 /
LEPPÄNEN, Jussi Artturi Kossinkatu 1B 33580 Tampere / FI | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | Higgin, Paul Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 16165856.2 | 18.04.2016 | [2017/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3236363 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06T19/00 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
G06T19/20 (EP,US);
G06F16/738 (US);
G06F16/957 (EP,US);
G06F3/013 (US);
G06F3/04815 (US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/16 (US);
G06T19/006 (EP,US);
G06F3/012 (US);
G06T2219/2004 (EP,US);
G10L19/008 (US);
H04R1/406 (US);
H04R3/005 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] |
Former [2017/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INHALTSSUCHE | [2017/43] | English: | CONTENT SEARCH | [2017/43] | French: | RECHERCHE DE CONTENU | [2017/43] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 25.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.09.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.09.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9715889 (WEGENER INTERNET PROJECTS B V [NL], et al) [X] 1,14,15 * page 11 - page 12; figures 3,5-10 * [I] 1-15; | [A]WO2014204755 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1,14,15* paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0093]; figures 10-14 *; | [A]WO2016001909 (IMAGINE MOBILE AUGMENTED REALITY LTD [IL]) [A] 1,14,15 * page 10, line 10 - page 11, line 7; figure 3 *; | [XI] - NAKAZATO M ET AL, "3D MARS: immersive virtual reality for content-based image retrieval", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO, (20010822), doi:10.1109/ICME.2001.1237651, ISBN 978-0-7695-1198-6, pages 45 - 48, XP032176913 [X] 1,14,15 * section 3; figures 1, 2 * [I] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICME.2001.1237651 |