EP3085931 - INTEGRATED VEHICLE CONTROL APPARATUS AND INTEGRATED CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIZAKI, Satoshi c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
KATO, Naoto c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
SUGIHIRA, Shigehiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN, 471-8571 / JP | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2016/43] | Application number, filing date | 16166411.5 | 21.04.2016 | [2016/43] | Priority number, date | JP20150089475 | 24.04.2015 Original published format: JP 2015089475 | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3085931 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/00, F02D41/02, F02D41/14, B60W30/19 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
F02D41/023 (EP,US);
F02D9/00 (CN);
F02D41/2461 (US);
B60W30/19 (US);
F02D41/0002 (EP,US);
F02D41/1497 (EP,US);
F16H63/50 (US);
F02D2250/18 (EP,US);
F02D2250/21 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE FAHRZEUGSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND INTEGRIERTES STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2016/43] | English: | INTEGRATED VEHICLE CONTROL APPARATUS AND INTEGRATED CONTROL METHOD | [2016/43] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE INTÉGRÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE INTÉGRÉ | [2016/43] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 18.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0887533 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4 * page 2, lines 5-8, 27-36; figure 2 * * page 3, lines 22-30, 42-44; figure 1B * * page 6, lines 5-9 * * page 8, line 17 - page 9, line 7; figures 10, 15 *; | [YA]US2004106498 (BADILLO EDWARD [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 3] , [00 5] - [0007] - [0 12] - [0013] - [0 16] , [0 46]; figures 2, 4, 5 * [A] 3; | [Y]DE102006005446 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0001] - [0011] - [0 12] - [0014] - [0 15] - [0019]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2202400 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4* paragraphs [0001] - [0002] - [00 7] - [0008] - [0 13] - [0016] - [0 88] - [0093]; figures 3, 4 *; | [Y]US2013045832 (WHITNEY CHRISTOPHER E [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [00 6] - [0009] - [0 17] - [0018] - [0 35] , [0 42] - [0044]; figure 5 * | by applicant | JP2009097445 |