EP3085720 - HYDROPHILIC MODIFIED POLYISOCYANURATE PLASTIC AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLIMMASCH, Thomas Am Kettnersbusch 13 51379 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
WEIKARD, Jan Tempelhofer Strasse 39 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
MATNER, Mathias Lützowstrasse 16h 41464 Neuss / DE | 04 /
ACHTEN, Dirk Salamanderweg 43 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 05 /
LAAS, Hans-Josef Amselweg 14 51519 Odenthal / DE | 06 /
HOCKE, Heiko Morsbroicher Strasse 48 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 07 /
MAGER, Dieter Carl-Leverkus-Strasse 31a 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2016/47] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 16166433.9 | 21.04.2016 | [2016/43] | Priority number, date | EP20150164518 | 21.04.2015 Original published format: EP 15164518 | EP20150164519 | 21.04.2015 Original published format: EP 15164519 | EP20150164520 | 21.04.2015 Original published format: EP 15164520 | EP20150164522 | 21.04.2015 Original published format: EP 15164522 | [2016/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3085720 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/73, C08G18/79, C08G18/02, C08G18/22, C08G18/28, C08G18/32, C08G18/38, C08G18/09, C08G18/80 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
C08G18/73 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/022 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/168 (US);
C08G18/1816 (US);
C08G18/225 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/283 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/289 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/4833 (US);
C08G18/792 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/8064 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/809 (EP,KR,US);
C08J5/18 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/38] |
Former [2016/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDROPHIL MODIFIZIERTER POLYISOCYANURATKUNSTSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2016/43] | English: | HYDROPHILIC MODIFIED POLYISOCYANURATE PLASTIC AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2016/43] | French: | MATIERES SYNTHETIQUES DE POLYISOCYANURATE A MODIFICATION HYDROPHILE ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2016/43] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/38] | 03.08.2017 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 21.08.2017 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 09.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/24] | 09.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3211703 (GILMAN LUCIUS G, et al) [A] 1-18 * column 1, lines 11-16 * * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 31; example -; claim - *; | [XDI]US6133397 (O'CONNOR JAMES M [US], et al) [XD] 1,6,7,10-18 * column 1, lines 10-20 * * column 3, lines 35-54 * * column 6, lines 31-64; examples 11-21; claim - * [I] 2-5,8,9; | [A]DE10142816 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [A] 1-18* paragraphs [0001] , [00 7] , [00 8] , [0 17] - [0019]; example 3 *; | [A] - Theodorus Flipsen, "Design, synthesis and properties of new materials based on densely crosslinked polymers for polymer optical fiber and amplifier applications", (20000101), URL: http://www.rug.nl/research/portal/files/3117200/thesis.pdf, (20151016), XP055221597 [A] 1-18 * pages 39-40 * * pages 132-134 * | by applicant | GB809809 | GB952931 | GB966338 | US3211703 | US3330828 | DE1570540 | DE1954093 | DE1670666 | DE1770245 | DE1667309 | GB1386399 | GB1391066 | DE2414413 | DE2446440 | DE2452532 | DE2631733 | DE2641380 | EP0003765 | EP0010589 | EP0013880 | EP0033581 | EP0047452 | EP0056158 | EP0056159 | DE3100263 | DE3219608 | EP0100129 | EP0102482 | DE3240613 | EP0206059 | DE3700209 | EP0287052 | DE3717060 | US4789705 | EP0330966 | EP0336205 | EP0339396 | GB2221465 | GB2222161 | DE3900053 | EP0379914 | DE3928503 | EP0443167 | EP0540985 | EP0668271 | EP0671426 | EP0798299 | EP0896009 | WO9923128 | EP0916647 | EP0959087 | EP0962455 | US6133397 | EP1229016 | WO2005087828 | EP1599526 | WO2013167404 | WO2015166983 | - J. PRAKT. CHEM., (1994), vol. 336, pages 185 - 200 | - JUSTUS LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE BAND, (1949), vol. 562, pages 75 - 136 | - Ullmanns Encyclopädie der technischen Chemie, VERLAG CHEMIE, vol. 19, pages 31 - 38 | - EUROPEAN POLYMER JOURNAL, (1979), vol. 16, pages 147 - 148 | - J. H. SAUNDERS; K. C. FRISCH, POLYURETHANES CHEMISTRY AND TECHNOLOGY, (1962), page 94 FF | EP20130196508 |