EP3088616 - METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF DISPENSING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reckitt Benckiser LLC Morris Corporate Center IV 399 Interpace Parkway Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | [2016/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arora, Nevin c/o Church & Dwight Inc. 469 North Harrison Street Princeton, NJ New Jersey 08540 / US | 02 /
Lu, Robert Zhong 159 Hamilton Avenue Hasbrouck Heights, NJ New Jersey 07604 / US | 03 /
Moseson, Dana 4700 6th Place NE Washington, DC District of Columbia 20017 / US | [2016/44] | Representative(s) | Bowers, Craig Malcolm, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | [2016/44] | Application number, filing date | 16166451.1 | 23.06.2009 | [2016/44] | Priority number, date | GB20080012142 | 03.07.2008 Original published format: GB 0812142 | [2016/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3088616 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E03D9/02, C11D1/83, C11D1/29, C11D1/52, C11D1/72, C11D1/86, C11D1/10, C11D17/00, C11D17/04, E03D9/03 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
E03D9/032 (EP,US);
A61L9/05 (GB);
E03D9/022 (GB,US);
C11D1/83 (EP,US);
C11D1/86 (EP,US);
C11D17/0056 (EP,GB,US);
C11D17/041 (EP,GB,US);
E03D9/007 (GB);
C11D1/10 (EP,US);
C11D1/29 (EP,US);
C11D1/523 (EP,US);
C11D1/72 (EP,US);
E03D2009/024 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ABGABEVORRICHTUNGEN | [2016/44] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF DISPENSING DEVICES | [2016/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE DISPOSITIFS DE DISTRIBUTION | [2016/44] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/46] | 21.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09772771.3 / EP2321477 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1815197 (WILSON GAMEL HARVEY, et al); | [A]GB460041 (SOUTH BANK CHEMICAL COMPANY LT, et al); | [A]US3088126 (KLINGLER JOSEF F); | [A]US3947901 (WILLERT AUGUST W); | [Y]EP0073542 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [A]WO2007107769 (RECKITT BENCKISER INC [US], et al); | [XY]WO2007148054 (RECKITT BENCKISER INC [US], et al) |