EP3088799 - ADJUSTABLE OPTICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zumtobel Lighting GmbH Schweizer Straße 30 6850 Dornbirn / AT | [2016/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwärzler, Erich Schweizberg 81 6941 Langenegg / AT | [2016/44] | Representative(s) | Kiwit, Benedikt Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/44] | Kiwit, Benedikt Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16166563.3 | 22.04.2016 | [2016/44] | Priority number, date | DE201520102145U | 29.04.2015 Original published format: DE 202015102145 U | [2016/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3088799 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3088799 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F21V5/00, F21V14/06, G02B7/02, // F21Y105/10, F21Y115/10 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
F21V14/06 (EP,AT,US);
F21V13/00 (AT);
F21V17/00 (AT);
F21V5/007 (EP,US);
F21V5/04 (AT);
G02B7/023 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] |
Former [2016/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERSTELLBARES OPTIKSYSTEM | [2016/44] | English: | ADJUSTABLE OPTICAL SYSTEM | [2016/44] | French: | SYSTEME OPTIQUE REGLABLE | [2016/44] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 13.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2016 | AL | 27.06.2018 | CY | 27.06.2018 | CZ | 27.06.2018 | DK | 27.06.2018 | EE | 27.06.2018 | ES | 27.06.2018 | FI | 27.06.2018 | HR | 27.06.2018 | IT | 27.06.2018 | LT | 27.06.2018 | LV | 27.06.2018 | MC | 27.06.2018 | MK | 27.06.2018 | MT | 27.06.2018 | NL | 27.06.2018 | PL | 27.06.2018 | RO | 27.06.2018 | RS | 27.06.2018 | SE | 27.06.2018 | SI | 27.06.2018 | SK | 27.06.2018 | SM | 27.06.2018 | TR | 27.06.2018 | BG | 27.09.2018 | NO | 27.09.2018 | GR | 28.09.2018 | IS | 27.10.2018 | PT | 29.10.2018 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 22.04.2016 | |
AL | 27.06.2018 | ||
CY | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
MT | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 22.04.2016 | |
AL | 27.06.2018 | ||
CY | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
CY | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4444471 (FORD JR JOHN W [US], et al) [X] 15 * page 2, line 3 - line 6 * * column 3, line 20 - line 32 * * figures 1-4 * [I] 1-3,6,8-14; | [A]JP2004119045 (OSRAM MELCO LTD) [A] 1-15 * figures 11-13 *; | [A]US2006268429 (CHANG CHI L [TW], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0008] * * figure 5 *; | [XA]DE102006016376 (SCHEFENACKER VISION SYSTEMS [DE]) [X] 15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0036] , [0062] * * figures 4-7 * [A] 1-14; | [A]EP1890076 (CCS INC [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0067] , [0077] * * figures 9,13,15 *; | [A]US2009015388 (YAGI TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] * * figures 2,6 *; | [A]KR101294210B (JEDIA CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 3,4 *; | [X]US2014168968 (STREPPEL HENRIKE [DE], et al) [X] 12-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraphs [0024] , [0026] , [0030] , [0036] , [0037] * * figures 1,2 *; | [XI]EP2860555 (OPTOTUNE AG [CH]) [X] 1-6,9-13,15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0014] , [0025] , [0026] , [0033] , [0052] , [0060] , [0088] , [0102] * * figures 4,5,7,11 * [I] 8 |