EP3086140 - SPHERICAL DEVICE FOR DETECTING PARTICLES OR RADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, Rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIOMATARIS, Ioannis 9 im. Nungesser et Coli 78000 VERSAILLES / FR | 02 /
MAGNIER, Patrick 30 Avenue Saint Laurent 91400 ORSAY / FR | 03 /
DERRE, Jacques 10 Rue Emile Morel 92330 SCEAUX / FR | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Camus Lebkiri 25 rue de Maubeuge 75009 Paris / FR | [2016/43] | Application number, filing date | 16166642.5 | 22.04.2016 | [2016/43] | Priority number, date | FR20150053683 | 24.04.2015 Original published format: FR 1553683 | [2016/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3086140 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3086140 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/185, G01T3/00 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
H01J37/32541 (EP,US);
G01T1/185 (EP,US);
G01T3/008 (EP,US);
H01J37/32596 (EP,US);
H01J47/026 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] |
Former [2016/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KUGELFÖRMIGE ERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG VON PARTIKELN ODER STRAHLUNG | [2016/43] | English: | SPHERICAL DEVICE FOR DETECTING PARTICLES OR RADIATION | [2016/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION SPHERIQUE DE PARTICULES OU DE RAYONNEMENT | [2016/43] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 24.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.09.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2016 | AL | 24.01.2018 | AT | 24.01.2018 | CY | 24.01.2018 | CZ | 24.01.2018 | DK | 24.01.2018 | EE | 24.01.2018 | ES | 24.01.2018 | FI | 24.01.2018 | HR | 24.01.2018 | LT | 24.01.2018 | LV | 24.01.2018 | MC | 24.01.2018 | MK | 24.01.2018 | MT | 24.01.2018 | NL | 24.01.2018 | PL | 24.01.2018 | PT | 24.01.2018 | RO | 24.01.2018 | RS | 24.01.2018 | SE | 24.01.2018 | SI | 24.01.2018 | SK | 24.01.2018 | SM | 24.01.2018 | TR | 24.01.2018 | IE | 22.04.2018 | LU | 22.04.2018 | BG | 24.04.2018 | NO | 24.04.2018 | GR | 25.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | IS | 24.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 22.04.2016 | |
AL | 24.01.2018 | ||
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PT | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
TR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IE | 22.04.2018 | ||
LU | 22.04.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PT | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
TR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IE | 22.04.2018 | ||
LU | 22.04.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
TR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IE | 22.04.2018 | ||
LU | 22.04.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
IE | 22.04.2018 | ||
LU | 22.04.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
LU | 22.04.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
LU | 22.04.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 24.01.2018 | |
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2492711 (TNO [NL]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0024] - [0026]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2013015778 (LI YUAN-YAO [TW], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0042]; figure 7 *; | [AD]FR3007848 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [AD] 1-11 * page 6, lines 6-25; figure 1 * | by applicant | FR3007848 |