EP3085765 - MODULAR INCUBATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Comecer S.p.A. Via Maestri del Lavoro, 90 48014 Castel Bolognese / IT | [2024/01] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states Comecer S.p.A. Via Maestri del Lavoro, 90 48014 Castel Bolognese / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CESARINI, Massimiliano c/o Comecer S.p.A. Via Maestri del Lavoro, 90 48014 Castel Bolognese / IT | 02 /
GALASSI, Filippo c/o Comecer S.p.A. Via Maestri del Lavoro, 90 48014 Castel Bolognese / IT | 03 /
ZANELLI, Alessia Via Firenze 75 interno 7 48018 Faenza / IT | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A., et al Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2024/01] |
Former [2016/43] | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 16166747.2 | 22.04.2016 | [2016/43] | Priority number, date | IT2015BO00206 | 23.04.2015 Original published format: IT BO20150206 | [2016/43] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3085765 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3085765 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/00, C12M3/00 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
C12M41/14 (EP,US);
C12M23/40 (US);
C12M23/44 (EP,US);
C12M23/52 (EP);
C12M41/48 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] |
Former [2016/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MODULARER INKUBATOR | [2016/43] | English: | MODULAR INCUBATOR | [2016/43] | French: | INCUBATEUR MODULAIRE | [2016/43] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/22] | 26.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 03.01.2024 | CZ | 03.01.2024 | ES | 03.01.2024 | HR | 03.01.2024 | LT | 03.01.2024 | LV | 03.01.2024 | NL | 03.01.2024 | PL | 03.01.2024 | SE | 03.01.2024 | NO | 03.04.2024 | RS | 03.04.2024 | GR | 04.04.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | PT | 03.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 03.01.2024 | |
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
LV | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
PL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
PT | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 03.01.2024 | |
CZ | 03.01.2024 | ||
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 03.01.2024 | |
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 03.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005244306 (STAHL HERMANN [DE], et al); | [A]US2010316446 (RUNYON LARRY [US]); | [Y]DE202013010260U (MEMMERT GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [A]WO2014086984 (TECH2ART APS [DK]); | [A]WO2014106526 (INHECO IND HEATING AND COOLING GMBH [DE]) | Examination | JP2006149232 |