EP3168981 - ROTOR POSITION DETECTION APPARATUS AND MOTOR CONTROL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sinfonia Technology Co., Ltd. 1-30, Shiba-daimon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8564 / JP | For all designated states Takahashi, Hisashi 5-3-19-604, Kamitsurumahoncho Minami-ku Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 252-0318 / JP | For all designated states Yamamoto, Kenji 6-1-14-706 Hashimoto Midori-ku Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 252-0143 / JP | [2017/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANAZAWA, Kazunari c/o SINFONIA TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. 1-30, Shiba-daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8564 / JP | 02 /
IKEDA, Hiroshi c/o SINFONIA TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. 1-30, Shiba-daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8564 / JP | 03 /
ITO, Yuki c/o SINFONIA TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. 1-30, Shiba-daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8564 / JP | 04 /
TOMIZAKI, Takeshi c/o SINFONIA TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. 1-30, Shiba-daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8564 / JP | 05 /
TAKAHASHI, Hisashi 5-3-19-604, Kamitsurumahoncho Minami-ku Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 252-0318 / JP | 06 /
YAMAMOTO, Kenji 6-1-14-706, Hashimoto, Midori-ku Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 252-0143 / JP | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2017/20] | Application number, filing date | 16167929.5 | 02.05.2016 | [2017/20] | Priority number, date | JP20150220722 | 10.11.2015 Original published format: JP 2015220722 | [2017/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3168981 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3168981 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02P1/16, H02P25/089, H02P6/182, H02P1/02 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
H02P25/089 (EP);
H02P1/029 (EP);
H02P1/163 (EP);
H02P6/182 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/20] | H02P25/089, H02P6/182, // H02P1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] |
Former [2017/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ROTORPOSITIONSERFASSUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND MOTORSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/20] | English: | ROTOR POSITION DETECTION APPARATUS AND MOTOR CONTROL APPARATUS | [2017/20] | French: | APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION DE POSITION DE ROTOR ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR | [2017/20] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 30.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.05.2016 | AL | 16.10.2019 | AT | 16.10.2019 | CY | 16.10.2019 | CZ | 16.10.2019 | DK | 16.10.2019 | EE | 16.10.2019 | ES | 16.10.2019 | FI | 16.10.2019 | HR | 16.10.2019 | IT | 16.10.2019 | LT | 16.10.2019 | LV | 16.10.2019 | MC | 16.10.2019 | MK | 16.10.2019 | MT | 16.10.2019 | NL | 16.10.2019 | PL | 16.10.2019 | RO | 16.10.2019 | RS | 16.10.2019 | SE | 16.10.2019 | SI | 16.10.2019 | SK | 16.10.2019 | SM | 16.10.2019 | TR | 16.10.2019 | BG | 16.01.2020 | NO | 16.01.2020 | GR | 17.01.2020 | IS | 16.02.2020 | PT | 17.02.2020 | GB | 02.05.2020 | IE | 02.05.2020 | LU | 02.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 02.05.2016 | |
AL | 16.10.2019 | ||
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CY | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
MT | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
TR | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
GB | 02.05.2020 | ||
IE | 02.05.2020 | ||
LU | 02.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
GB | 02.05.2020 | ||
IE | 02.05.2020 | ||
LU | 02.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
GB | 02.05.2020 | ||
IE | 02.05.2020 | ||
LU | 02.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IE | 02.05.2020 | ||
LU | 02.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
LU | 02.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
MC | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SI | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
IT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
SK | 16.10.2019 | ||
SM | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
DK | 16.10.2019 | ||
EE | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
IS | 16.02.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RO | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
ES | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 16.10.2019 | |
AT | 16.10.2019 | ||
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 16.10.2019 | |
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
HR | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
RS | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 16.10.2019 | |
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 16.10.2019 | |
FI | 16.10.2019 | ||
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
LV | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
PL | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
GR | 17.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 16.10.2019 | |
LT | 16.10.2019 | ||
NL | 16.10.2019 | ||
SE | 16.10.2019 | ||
BG | 16.01.2020 | ||
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
PT | 17.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 16.10.2019 | |
NO | 16.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 16.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5180960 (AUSTERMANN RALF [DE]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document * [I] 2,4,5; | [A]EP0642213 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,4 * column 5, line 12 - column 6, line 47 *; | [XAI]EP1471629 (SWITCHED RELUCTANCE DRIVES LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029]; figures 5, 6; claims 1, 4, 7 * * paragraphs [0014] , [0 38] * [A] 2-4 [I] 5; | [XI] - FERRERO A ET AL, "A DIGITAL METHOD FOR THE DETERMINATION OF THE MAGNETIC CHARACTERISTIC OF VARIABLE RELUCTANCE MOTORS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19900801), vol. 39, no. 4, doi:10.1109/19.57241, ISSN 0018-9456, pages 604 - 608, XP000147631 [X] 1,2 * Sections I, III, IV, IV.B;; figures 1, 7 * [I] 3,5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/19.57241 | [A] - T J E MILLER, "Electrical Control of Switched Reluctance Machines", NEWNES POWER ENGINEERING SERIES, (20011231), ISBN 0750650737, XP040425932 [A] 1-5 * page 156 * | Examination | US2002149331 | by applicant | - AKIYOSHI KOMATSUZAKI; YOJIRO MIURA; ICHIRO MIKI, "Position Sensorless Control of SRM Using Space Vector Display of Self-inductance", INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS STUDY GROUP DOCUMENT. RM, ROTATING MACHINE STUDY GROUP 2008 (90, (20081112), pages 11 - 16 |