EP3098800 - INTEGRATION OF BRAKING ACTION INFORMATION WITH FLIGHT DECK RUNWAY FUNCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/04] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O.Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | ||
Former [2016/48] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Intellectual Property-Patent Services 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O.Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHATWA, Ratan HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3, P. O. Box 377 Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | 02 /
KANAGARAJAN, Sivakumar HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | 03 /
NATHAN, Visvanathan Thanigai HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Intellectual Property-Patent Services P.O. Box 377 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | [2016/48] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2016/48] | Application number, filing date | 16169190.2 | 11.05.2016 | [2016/48] | Priority number, date | US201514722931 | 27.05.2015 Original published format: US201514722931 | [2016/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3098800 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3098800 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G08G5/00, B60T8/17, G05D1/00, G08G5/02 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
B60T8/1703 (EP,US);
B64D45/04 (US);
B64D45/00 (US);
G05D1/0083 (US);
G08G5/0013 (EP,US);
G08G5/0021 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/48] | Title | German: | INTEGRATION VON BREMSVORGANGSINFORMATIONEN MIT FLUGDECKLANDEBAHNFUNKTIONEN | [2016/48] | English: | INTEGRATION OF BRAKING ACTION INFORMATION WITH FLIGHT DECK RUNWAY FUNCTIONS | [2016/48] | French: | INTÉGRATION D'INFORMATIONS D'ACTION DE FREINAGE AVEC FONCTIONS DE PISTE DE POSTE DE PILOTAGE | [2016/48] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/48] | 24.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.05.2020 | 12.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.05.2016 | AL | 27.01.2021 | AT | 27.01.2021 | CY | 27.01.2021 | CZ | 27.01.2021 | DK | 27.01.2021 | EE | 27.01.2021 | ES | 27.01.2021 | FI | 27.01.2021 | HR | 27.01.2021 | IT | 27.01.2021 | LT | 27.01.2021 | LV | 27.01.2021 | MC | 27.01.2021 | MK | 27.01.2021 | MT | 27.01.2021 | NL | 27.01.2021 | PL | 27.01.2021 | RO | 27.01.2021 | RS | 27.01.2021 | SE | 27.01.2021 | SI | 27.01.2021 | SK | 27.01.2021 | SM | 27.01.2021 | TR | 27.01.2021 | BG | 27.04.2021 | NO | 27.04.2021 | GR | 28.04.2021 | IE | 11.05.2021 | LU | 11.05.2021 | IS | 27.05.2021 | PT | 27.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 11.05.2016 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
MK | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
TR | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 11.05.2021 | ||
LU | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 11.05.2016 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
MK | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 11.05.2021 | ||
LU | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 11.05.2016 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CY | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 11.05.2021 | ||
LU | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 11.05.2016 | |
AL | 27.01.2021 | ||
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 11.05.2021 | ||
LU | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 11.05.2021 | ||
LU | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
IT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 11.05.2021 | ||
LU | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IE | 11.05.2021 | ||
LU | 11.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SI | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 11.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 11.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LU | 11.05.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 27.01.2021 | |
AT | 27.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
MC | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
ES | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RO | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SK | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
DK | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
CZ | 27.01.2021 | ||
EE | 27.01.2021 | ||
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
SM | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
IS | 27.05.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
PL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
SE | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 27.01.2021 | |
FI | 27.01.2021 | ||
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
LV | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
RS | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
BG | 27.04.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
GR | 28.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
HR | 27.01.2021 | ||
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NL | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 27.01.2021 | |
LT | 27.01.2021 | ||
NO | 27.04.2021 | ||
PT | 27.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008249675 (GOODMAN WILLIAM L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,9 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0099] * * figures 7d,7h,8b *; | [X]US2009125168 (VOISIN PAUL A [US]) [X] 1,5-8 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0036] * * figures 4a-4c *; | [X]US2011166723 (VILLAUME FABRICE [FR], et al) [X] 1,6,7,9 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0116] *; | [XI]WO2011119634 (BOEING CO [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0086] * [I] 4; | [XA]EP2800082 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0048] *[A] 3 |