EP3118918 - FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.09.2019 [2019/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2017/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIURA, Yohei c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd., Legal Affairs & Intellectual Property Dept 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 02 /
OHMORI, Makoto c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd., Legal Affairs & Intellectual Property Dept 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 03 /
KOBAYASHI, Ayano c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd., Legal Affairs & Intellectual Property Dept 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 04 /
TERAHAI, Takafumi c/o NGK Insulators, Ltd., Legal Affairs & Intellectual Property Dept 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-city, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2017/03] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/03] | Naylor, Matthew John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 16169377.5 | 05.10.2012 | [2017/03] | Priority number, date | JP20110227418 | 14.10.2011 Original published format: JP 2011227418 | JP20120136509 | 18.06.2012 Original published format: JP 2012136509 | JP20120158576 | 17.07.2012 Original published format: JP 2012158576 | JP20120196183 | 06.09.2012 Original published format: JP 2012196183 | JP20120214868 | 27.09.2012 Original published format: JP 2012214868 | [2017/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3118918 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/86, H01M4/90, H01M8/1253, H01M8/1213, H01M8/124 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
H01M8/1213 (EP,US);
H01M4/8605 (US);
H01M4/8621 (EP,US);
H01M4/8663 (EP,US);
H01M4/9066 (EP,US);
H01M8/1004 (US);
H01M8/1253 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1293 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0077 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLE | [2017/03] | English: | FUEL CELL | [2017/03] | French: | PILE A COMBUSTIBLE | [2017/03] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.06.2016 | Examination requested [2017/03] | 05.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 14.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12840303.7 / EP2768053 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.11.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 14.11.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.11.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2688128 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [E] 1-13 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0082] * * table 1 * | [XY] - CRONIN J S ET AL, "Impact of pore microstructure evolution on polarization resistance of Ni-Yttria-stabilized zirconia fuel cell anodes", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER SA, CH, vol. 196, no. 5, ISSN 0378-7753, (20110301), pages 2640 - 2643, (20101103), XP027566919 [X] 1,3-8 * figure 2 * * 2. Experimental * * 3. Results and discussion * [Y] 2,9-13 | [Y] - KAZUNARI SASAKI ET AL, "Impurity Poisoning of SOFCs", ECS TRANSACTIONS, US, (20110101), doi:10.1149/1.3570280, ISSN 1938-5862, pages 2805 - 2814, XP055316915 [Y] 2,9-13 * table 1 * * Experimental Procedures of Poisoning Tests * * Results and Discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.3570280 | [Y] - KAZUNARI SASAKI ET AL, "Chemical durability of Solid Oxide Fuel Cells: Influence of impurities on long-term performance", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER SA, CH, vol. 196, no. 22, doi:10.1016/J.JPOWSOUR.2010.09.122, ISSN 0378-7753, (20100910), pages 9130 - 9140, (20110628), XP028283630 [Y] 2,9-13 * 4. Anode poisoning * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpowsour.2010.09.122 | [Y] - CHO H J ET AL, "Fabrication and characterization of Ni-supported solid oxide fuel cell", SOLID STATE IONICS, NORTH HOLLAND PUB. COMPANY. AMSTERDAM; NL, NL, vol. 180, no. 11-13, doi:10.1016/J.SSI.2008.12.041, ISSN 0167-2738, (20090622), pages 792 - 795, (20090303), XP026148437 [Y] 2,9-13 * 3. Results and Discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ssi.2008.12.041 | by applicant | JP2006032132 |