EP3246724 - A METHOD, APPARATUS, SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR CONTROLLING A POSITIONING MODULE AND/OR AN AUDIO CAPTURE MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2017/47] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cricri, Francesco Papinkatu 13 A 11 33200 Tampere / FI | 02 /
Leppänen, Jussi Artturi Kossinkatu 1B 33580 Tampere / FI | 03 /
Eronen, Antti Johannes Rintamäenkatu 13 A 6 33820 Tampere / FI | 04 /
Lehtiniemi, Arto Juhani Lomarantatie 17 33880 Lempäälä / FI | [2017/47] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2017/47] | Application number, filing date | 16170487.9 | 19.05.2016 | [2017/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3246724 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02, H04N5/00 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
G01S5/0205 (EP);
G01S5/021 (US);
H04R1/326 (US);
G01S19/34 (EP,US);
G01S5/01 (EP,US);
G06F16/60 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] |
Former [2017/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM ZUM STEUERN EINES POSITIONIERMODULS UND/ODER EINES AUDIOERFASSUNGSMODULS | [2017/47] | English: | A METHOD, APPARATUS, SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM FOR CONTROLLING A POSITIONING MODULE AND/OR AN AUDIO CAPTURE MODULE | [2017/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL, SYSTÈME ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE POUR COMMANDER UN MODULE DE POSITIONNEMENT ET/OU UN MODULE DE CAPTURE AUDIO | [2017/47] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 07.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/17] | 21.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007150512 (KONG YUAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9,12-15 * figures 4,8 * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0061] * [I] 3,10,11; | [A]WO2011072273 (MAXLINEAR INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013102268 (WANG CHENYU [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US8831505 (SESHADRI PRASAD [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015081699 (LEPPANEN JUSSI [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0092] * |