EP3098932 - AUTOMATED ROBOTIC BATTERY TUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The AES Corporation 4300 Wilson Boulevard Arlington, Virginia 22203 / US | [2016/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHELTON, John C. c/o The AES Corporation 4300 Wilson Boulevard Arlington, VA Virginia 22203 / US | 02 /
GALURA, Brett Lance c/o The AES Corporation 4300 Wilson Boulevard Arlington, VA Virginia 22203 / US | 03 /
GEINZER, Jay c/o The AES Corporation 4300 Wilson Boulevard Arlington, VA Virginia 22203 / US | 04 /
JEFFERSON, Isaiah c/o The AES Corporation 4300 Wilson Boulevard Arlington, VA Virginia 22203 / US | 05 /
PERUSE, Brian c/o The AES Corporation 4300 Wilson Boulevard Arlington, VA Virginia 22203 / US | [2016/48] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/48] | Awapatent AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 16171154.4 | 24.05.2016 | [2016/48] | Priority number, date | US201514721522 | 26.05.2015 Original published format: US201514721522 | [2016/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3098932 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
H02J7/0044 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (BR);
B25J9/162 (KR,US);
B65G1/04 (CN);
B25J11/008 (KR);
B25J19/005 (KR);
B25J5/007 (BR,KR);
B25J9/1661 (KR);
B25J9/1679 (KR);
B25J9/1697 (US);
B65G1/137 (CN);
H02J13/0006 (CN);
H02J3/32 (CN);
H02J7/0013 (EP,BR,CN,KR,US);
H02J7/0045 (EP,US);
H02J7/342 (KR);
G06Q50/40 (BR);
H02J2310/22 (EP,BR,CN,KR,US);
H02J7/00034 (EP,US);
Y02B70/30 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] |
Former [2016/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTER, ROBOTISCHE BATTERIESCHLEPPER | [2016/48] | English: | AUTOMATED ROBOTIC BATTERY TUG | [2016/48] | French: | REMORQUEUR À BATTERIE ROBOTIQUE AUTOMATISÉE | [2016/48] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 05.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 17.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2011106294 (BEBBINGTON CHARLES P [US]) [X] 13 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] * * figures 1-4 *[A] 14,15; | [XA]US2012045303 (MACDONALD MURRAY [CA]) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0027] * * figures 1, 2, 4 * [A] 2-5,7-15; | [XA]US8736228 (FREED IAN W [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7 * figures 1-2, 5-7 * * column 6, line 18 - column 6, line 51 * * column 8, line 38 - column 10, line 50 * * column 13, line 55 - column 14, line 13 * * column 14, line 44 - column 15, line 46 * [A] 3,4,6,8-15 |