EP3101021 - ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT MATERIALS AND DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ 08618 / US | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAM, Siu Tung c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | 02 /
KWONG, Raymond c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | 03 /
LEE, Chi Hang c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | 04 /
TSANG, Kit Yee c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/33] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/49] | Hansen, Norbert Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16171317.7 | 25.05.2016 | [2016/49] | Priority number, date | US201562169157P | 01.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562169157 P | US201615147543 | 05.05.2016 Original published format: US201615147543 | [2016/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3101021 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3101021 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07F5/02, H01L51/00, C09K11/02, C09K11/06, H01L51/50 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
C07F5/02 (EP,US);
C07F5/022 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/322 (US);
C07F5/027 (US);
C09K11/025 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
H10K50/16 (KR);
H10K85/342 (US);
H10K85/657 (EP,US);
H10K85/6574 (EP,US);
H10K85/658 (EP,KR);
C07F5/05 (US);
C09K2211/1007 (US);
C09K2211/1044 (US);
C09K2211/185 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/49] | C07F5/02, H01L51/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] |
Former [2016/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ORGANISCHE ELEKTROLUMINESZENTE MATERIALIEN UND VORRICHTUNGEN | [2016/49] | English: | ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT MATERIALS AND DEVICES | [2016/49] | French: | MATERIAUX ELECTROLUMINESCENTS ORGANIQUES ET DISPOSITFS | [2016/49] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 12.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.05.2016 | AL | 15.08.2018 | AT | 15.08.2018 | CY | 15.08.2018 | CZ | 15.08.2018 | DK | 15.08.2018 | EE | 15.08.2018 | ES | 15.08.2018 | FI | 15.08.2018 | HR | 15.08.2018 | IT | 15.08.2018 | LT | 15.08.2018 | LV | 15.08.2018 | MC | 15.08.2018 | MK | 15.08.2018 | MT | 15.08.2018 | NL | 15.08.2018 | PL | 15.08.2018 | RO | 15.08.2018 | RS | 15.08.2018 | SE | 15.08.2018 | SI | 15.08.2018 | SK | 15.08.2018 | SM | 15.08.2018 | TR | 15.08.2018 | BG | 15.11.2018 | NO | 15.11.2018 | GR | 16.11.2018 | IS | 15.12.2018 | PT | 15.12.2018 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 25.05.2016 | |
AL | 15.08.2018 | ||
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
MT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 25.05.2016 | |
AL | 15.08.2018 | ||
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 15.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1198372 (SHELL INT RESEARCH); | [X]US3392181 (ELMAR-MANFRED HORN); | [A]US2014027734 (KWONG RAYMOND [US]); | by applicant | KR20090133652 | US4769292 | US5061569 | US5247190 | JPH0773529 | EP0650955 | US5639914 | US5703436 | US5707745 | US5834893 | US5844363 | US6013982 | US6087196 | US6091195 | US6097147 | WO0139234 | US2001019782 | US6294398 | US6303238 | US6337102 | WO0215645 | US2002034656 | US6413656 | EP1239526 | EP1244155 | US6468819 | US2002158242 | US6517957 | US2003068526 | US2003072964 | WO03040257 | US2003138657 | WO03060956 | US2003162053 | US2003175553 | US6653654 | US6656612 | US2003230980 | US6670645 | JP2004022334 | US6687266 | US2004036077 | US6699599 | US2004174116 | WO2004093207 | US6835469 | WO2005014551 | WO2005019373 | JP2005112765 | US2005123751 | US2005123788 | US2005123791 | JP2005149918 | US2005139810 | US6916554 | US6921915 | WO2005075451 | WO2005089025 | JP2005268199 | US2005238919 | US2005244673 | CN1696137 | US2005260449 | EP1602648 | US2006008670 | EP1617493 | EP1624500 | US2006065890 | EP1642951 | EP1647554 | WO2006056418 | US2006127696 | US2006134459 | US2006134462 | WO2006072002 | WO2006081780 | WO2006081973 | US2006182993 | EP1698613 | US2006202194 | US2006240279 | WO2006114966 | US2006251923 | WO2006121811 | EP1725079 | US2006280965 | EP1734038 | US7154114 | US2007018155 | US2007034863 | WO2007018067 | JP2007091719 | US2007087321 | US2007103060 | US2007104979 | US2007104980 | US2007104977 | US2007111026 | WO2007063754 | US2007138437 | US2007145888 | EP1806334 | US2007160905 | US2007181874 | US2007190359 | US2007224450 | WO2007108362 | JP2007254297 | US2007231600 | WO2007111263 | US7279704 | EP1841834 | WO2007115970 | WO2007115981 | US2007252140 | WO2007125714 | US2007278938 | US2007278936 | US2008005851 | US2008014464 | US2008020237 | JP2008021687 | US7332232 | WO2008023550 | WO2008023759 | WO2008035571 | US2008091025 | US2008106190 | US2008107919 | WO2008054584 | WO2008056746 | US7378162 | US2008124572 | EP1930964 | US2008145707 | US2008161567 | WO2008078800 | EP1956007 | WO2008096609 | EP1961743 | WO2008101842 | US2008210930 | EP1968131 | US2008220265 | EP1972613 | US2008233434 | US2008233410 | US7431968 | US2008261076 | EP1997799 | US2008297033 | US2008303417 | WO2009000673 | EP2011790 | WO2009003455 | WO2009003898 | WO2009008277 | US2009017330 | WO2009011327 | US2009030202 | EP2020694 | WO2009021126 | US2009039776 | EP2034538 | US2009066235 | US2009085476 | US2009104472 | WO2009050281 | US2009101870 | US2009108737 | EP2055700 | EP2055701 | EP1841834 | US2009115320 | US2009115322 | US2009115316 | US7534505 | WO2009063833 | EP2062907 | WO2009066778 | WO2009066779 | US2009140637 | US2009167167 | US2009167161 | US2009167162 | WO2009086028 | US2009179555 | US2009179554 | EP2085382 | WO2009100991 | US2009218940 | WO2009145016 | US2009302743 | WO2009148269 | US2009309488 | US2010012931 | US7675228 | WO2010028151 | US2010084966 | US2010090591 | US2010102716 | US2010105902 | US2010108990 | WO2010056066 | WO2010054731 | US7728137 | WO2010061824 | JP4478555B | US2010148663 | WO2010067894 | US7740957 | WO2010072300 | KR20100079458 | US7759489 | US2010187984 | WO2010086089 | WO2010107244 | US2010244004 | WO2010118029 | US2010270916 | US2010288362 | US2010295032 | US2011007385 | US2011057559 | WO2011044988 | WO2011051404 | US2011108822 | US7951947 | WO2011075644 | WO2011074770 | US7968146 | US2011156017 | US2011163302 | WO2011081423 | WO2011081431 | WO2011086863 | KR20110088898 | US2011204333 | US2011210320 | WO2011105373 | US2011215710 | WO2011107491 | US2011227049 | US2011240968 | TW201139402 | US2011278551 | US2011285275 | US8067099 | WO2012020327 | US2012075273 | KR20120032054 | JP2012074444 | US2012126221 | US2012146012 | US2012193612 | KR20120088644 | US2012205642 | US2012214993 | WO2012128298 | CN102702075 | WO2012133644 | WO2012133649 | US2012292601 | KR20120129733 | WO2012163471 | WO2012177006 | US2013009543 | WO2013018530 | US2013033172 | WO2013024872 | WO2013035275 | WO2013039073 | US8415031 | DE102012005215 | KR20130043460 | US2013105787 | WO2013081315 | JP2013110263 | WO2013079217 | US2013146848 | WO2013087142 | US2013165653 | WO2013094620 | KR20130077473 | US2013175519 | TW201329200 | US2013181190 | WO2013107487 | WO2013118812 | TW201332980 | WO2013120577 | US2013241401 | KR20130108183 | WO2013145667 | KR20130115564 | WO2013157367 | KR20130117693 | EP2660300 | US8592586 | WO2013175747 | WO2013174471 | WO2013180376 | US2013334521 | WO2013191404 | US2014001446 | WO2014002873 | WO2014007565 | EP2684932 | CN103508940 | WO2014009310 | WO2014008982 | US2014014925 | US2014014927 | JP2014009196 | WO2014015935 | WO2014015937 | US2014034914 | WO2014023377 | WO2014024131 | WO2014030872 | WO2014030921 | WO2014031977 | WO2014034791 | WO2014038456 | CN103694277 | US2014103305 | US2014117329 | EP2730583 | US2014183517 | WO2014104514 | US2014183503 | WO2014104499 | WO2014104535 | EP2757608 | WO2014112450 | US2014225088 | US2014246656 | WO2014142472 | US2014284580 | WO2014157018 | US8871361 | US2015060804 |