EP3249476 - SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leuze electronic GmbH + Co KG In der Braike 1 73277 Owen/Teck / DE | [2017/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolf, Tilo Siedlerstr. 8 73240 Wendlingen / DE | 02 /
Feller, Bernhard Am Fladerlach 10 86316 Friedberg / DE | [2017/48] | Representative(s) | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Ruckh Jurastraße 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/48] | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwalt Jurastrasse 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | Application number, filing date | 16171318.5 | 25.05.2016 | [2017/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3249476 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3249476 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G05B9/03 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
G05B9/03 (EP);
G05B2219/24173 (EP);
G05B2219/24184 (EP);
G05B2219/24187 (EP);
G05B2219/25163 (EP);
G05B2219/33235 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] | Title | German: | SENSOR | [2017/48] | English: | SENSOR | [2017/48] | French: | CAPTEUR | [2017/48] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 22.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.02.2022 | 15.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 31.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 15.06.2022 | CZ | 15.06.2022 | DK | 15.06.2022 | EE | 15.06.2022 | ES | 15.06.2022 | FI | 15.06.2022 | HR | 15.06.2022 | IT | 15.06.2022 | LT | 15.06.2022 | LV | 15.06.2022 | MC | 15.06.2022 | NL | 15.06.2022 | PL | 15.06.2022 | RO | 15.06.2022 | RS | 15.06.2022 | SE | 15.06.2022 | SI | 15.06.2022 | SK | 15.06.2022 | SM | 15.06.2022 | BG | 15.09.2022 | NO | 15.09.2022 | GR | 16.09.2022 | IS | 15.10.2022 | PT | 17.10.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | CZ | 15.06.2022 | |
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | CZ | 15.06.2022 | |
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 15.06.2022 | |
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 15.06.2022 | |
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE10342390 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-7,11-14 * figure 1; claim 1 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0024] * [Y] 8-10; | [XYI]EP1480060 (LEUZE LUMIFLEX GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,8-12,16 * figures 1-3; claims 1, 3, 7, 9-11, 19 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0054] * [Y] 8-10 [I] 5-7,13-15; | [X]DE102006046286 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,8-14 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 16] , [0 23]; figures 3-5 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0045] *; | [XI]EP2637067 (PILZ GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,8-12 * figures 1, 2; claim 1 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0066] * [I] 5-7,13-15; | [A]WO2014204300 (VANDERLANDE IND BV [NL]) [A] 15 * figures 1, 2; claim 1 * * page 1, line 5 - page 8, line 3 *; | [A]EP3015755 (SICK AG [DE]) [A] 1,11,16* abstract * | Examination | US5920715 |