EP3098965 - UNIVERSAL CONTROL BUTTON WITH HALL EFFECT FOR HUMAN-MACHINE INTERFACE, AND HUMAN-MACHINE INTERFACE PROVIDED WITH SUCH A CONTROL BUTTON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Safran Electronics & Defense Cockpit Solutions 7, rue des Longs Quartiers 93100 Montreuil / FR | [2020/49] |
Former [2016/48] | For all designated states Zodiac Aero Electric 7, rue des Longs Quartiers 93100 Montreuil / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMAO, Antonio 13, avenue du Ponant 92390 Villeneuve La Garenne / FR | [2020/29] |
Former [2016/48] | 01 /
SIMAO, Antonio 13 avenue du Ponant 92390 Villeneuve La Garenne / FR | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2016/48] | Application number, filing date | 16171342.5 | 25.05.2016 | [2016/48] | Priority number, date | FR20150054733 | 27.05.2015 Original published format: FR 1554733 | [2016/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3098965 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3098965 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/47] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3098965 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/972, G06F3/02, H01H11/00, H01H19/08 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
G06F3/0202 (EP,US);
G05B19/04 (CN);
H03K17/9517 (US);
B64D43/00 (US);
G05G1/02 (US);
G05G1/08 (US);
H03K17/972 (EP,US);
H01H11/0018 (EP,US);
H03K2217/94068 (EP,US);
H03K2217/96042 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/48] | Title | German: | UNIVERSALSTEUERKNOPF MIT HALL-EFFEKT FÜR MENSCH-MASCHINE-SCHNITTSTELLE, UND MIT EINEM SOLCHEN STEUERKNOPF AUSGESTATTETE MENSCH-MASCHINE-SCHNITTSTELLE | [2016/48] | English: | UNIVERSAL CONTROL BUTTON WITH HALL EFFECT FOR HUMAN-MACHINE INTERFACE, AND HUMAN-MACHINE INTERFACE PROVIDED WITH SUCH A CONTROL BUTTON | [2016/48] | French: | BOUTON DE COMMANDE UNIVERSEL À EFFET HALL POUR INTERFACE HOMME-MACHINE ET INTERFACE HOMME-MACHINE DOTÉE DE TEL BOUTON DE COMMANDE | [2016/48] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 21.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.05.2016 | AL | 18.11.2020 | AT | 18.11.2020 | CY | 18.11.2020 | CZ | 18.11.2020 | DK | 18.11.2020 | EE | 18.11.2020 | ES | 18.11.2020 | FI | 18.11.2020 | HR | 18.11.2020 | LT | 18.11.2020 | LV | 18.11.2020 | MC | 18.11.2020 | MK | 18.11.2020 | MT | 18.11.2020 | NL | 18.11.2020 | PL | 18.11.2020 | RO | 18.11.2020 | RS | 18.11.2020 | SE | 18.11.2020 | SI | 18.11.2020 | SK | 18.11.2020 | SM | 18.11.2020 | BG | 18.02.2021 | NO | 18.02.2021 | GR | 19.02.2021 | IS | 18.03.2021 | PT | 18.03.2021 | IE | 25.05.2021 | LU | 25.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 25.05.2016 | |
AL | 18.11.2020 | ||
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
MK | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 25.05.2021 | ||
LU | 25.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 25.05.2016 | |
AL | 18.11.2020 | ||
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CY | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 25.05.2021 | ||
LU | 25.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 25.05.2016 | |
AL | 18.11.2020 | ||
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 25.05.2021 | ||
LU | 25.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 25.05.2021 | ||
LU | 25.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 25.05.2021 | ||
LU | 25.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
IE | 25.05.2021 | ||
LU | 25.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
LU | 25.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
LU | 25.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
MC | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
ES | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SI | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
NL | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 18.11.2020 | |
AT | 18.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
DK | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
EE | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RO | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SK | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
CZ | 18.11.2020 | ||
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LT | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
SM | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
HR | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
PL | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
IS | 18.03.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 18.11.2020 | |
FI | 18.11.2020 | ||
LV | 18.11.2020 | ||
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
SE | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 18.02.2021 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
GR | 19.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
RS | 18.11.2020 | ||
NO | 18.02.2021 | ||
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 18.11.2020 | |
PT | 18.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 18.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008238650 (RIIHIMAKI ROY E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031]; figures 2, 4 * [I] 3,4,7,9,10; | [XI]EP2781993 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC IND SAS [FR]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1-4 * [I] 3,4,7,9,10; | [A]EP2814048 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC IND SAS [FR]) [A] 1-11* abstract * | Examination | US4354077 |