EP3153969 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CUSTOMIZING A VEHICLE OPERATING ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2017/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANTER, Nuri Gokhan 5 Pony Lane Flemington, New Jersey 08822 / US | [2017/15] | Representative(s) | HGF 8th Floor 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/15] | HGF Limited 8th Floor 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | Application number, filing date | 16171773.1 | 27.05.2016 | [2017/15] | Priority number, date | US201514876172 | 06.10.2015 Original published format: US201514876172 | KR20160015672 | 11.02.2016 Original published format: KR 20160015672 | [2017/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3153969 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445, B60K37/02, G06F9/44 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
G06F9/451 (EP,US);
B60K35/00 (EP);
B60K35/10 (EP);
B60K35/65 (EP,US);
B60K35/80 (EP,US);
B60K35/85 (EP);
G06F8/65 (EP);
B60K2360/55 (EP,US);
B60K2360/573 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ANPASSEN EINER FAHRZEUGBETRIEBSUMGEBUNG | [2017/15] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CUSTOMIZING A VEHICLE OPERATING ENVIRONMENT | [2017/15] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR PERSONNALISER UN ENVIRONNEMENT DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE VÉHICULE | [2017/15] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2016 | Examination requested [2017/15] | 27.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.12.2019 | 19.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/15] | 29.11.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/15] | 05.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011093136 (MOINZADEH KAMYAR [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0123] *; | [I]US2015266378 (HWANG DOE YUN [KR], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0065] *; | [A] - Andy Gryc ET AL, "Warum HTML5 die HMI-Technologie der Zukunft ist", (20120718), URL: http://www.qnx.com/download/feature.html?programid=23790, (20131107), XP055087122 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |