EP3101885 - LIGHTING DEVICE, IMAGE READING DEVICE, AND IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIDA, Masatoshi c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
NAGAO, Yoshiaki c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
NARAI, Satoshi c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 04 /
SUGAI, Atsushi c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 05 /
KISHI, Masafumi c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | 06 /
NODA, Makoto c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/36] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2016/49] | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16171809.3 | 27.05.2016 | [2016/49] | Priority number, date | JP20150111774 | 01.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015111774 | [2016/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3101885 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3101885 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00, H04N1/193, H04N1/028 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
H04N1/02895 (EP,US);
G03G15/50 (US);
H04N1/02815 (EP,US);
H04N1/02835 (EP,US);
H04N1/193 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/49] | H04N1/028 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDLESEVORRICHTUNG UND BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/49] | English: | LIGHTING DEVICE, IMAGE READING DEVICE, AND IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS | [2016/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE, DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE D'IMAGES ET APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'IMAGES | [2016/49] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/49] | 27.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2016 | AL | 04.09.2019 | AT | 04.09.2019 | CY | 04.09.2019 | CZ | 04.09.2019 | DK | 04.09.2019 | EE | 04.09.2019 | ES | 04.09.2019 | FI | 04.09.2019 | HR | 04.09.2019 | IT | 04.09.2019 | LT | 04.09.2019 | LV | 04.09.2019 | MC | 04.09.2019 | MK | 04.09.2019 | MT | 04.09.2019 | PL | 04.09.2019 | RO | 04.09.2019 | RS | 04.09.2019 | SE | 04.09.2019 | SI | 04.09.2019 | SK | 04.09.2019 | SM | 04.09.2019 | TR | 04.09.2019 | BG | 04.12.2019 | NO | 04.12.2019 | GR | 05.12.2019 | IS | 05.01.2020 | PT | 06.01.2020 | IE | 27.05.2020 | LU | 27.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 27.05.2016 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
MT | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
TR | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 27.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 27.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 27.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
LU | 27.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 04.09.2019 | |
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 04.09.2019 | |
NO | 04.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009244654 (TAGAWA HIROTOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 6-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010129116 (SHINKAWA SHOHEI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]KR20110006582 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [XY]US2012133994 (YAMASAKI SHUNSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [Y] 6-10; | [A]US2013265619 (KOBAYASHI HIDEKAZU [JP]) [A] 1-10* the whole document * | by applicant | JP2013118523 |