EP3101433 - SCANNING PROBE MICROSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi High-Tech Science Corporation 24-14, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDO, Kazunori c/O HITACHI HIGH-TECH SCIENCE CORPORATION 24-14, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Chaillot 16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2016/49] | Application number, filing date | 16171894.5 | 30.05.2016 | [2016/49] | Priority number, date | JP20150111872 | 02.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015111872 | [2016/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3101433 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01Q30/20, G01Q30/16 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
G01Q30/16 (EP,US);
G01Q10/065 (KR);
H01J37/28 (CN);
G01Q30/02 (CN);
G01Q30/06 (KR);
G01Q30/08 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2016/49] | G01Q30/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/29] |
Former [2016/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RASTERSONDENMIKROSKOP | [2016/49] | English: | SCANNING PROBE MICROSCOPE | [2016/49] | French: | MICROSCOPE À BALAYAGE DE SONDE | [2020/20] |
Former [2016/49] | MICROSCOPE À SONDE DE LECTURE OPTIQUE | Examination procedure | 30.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/29] | 03.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/17] | 11.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008224374 (HASUDA MASAKATSU [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-7,9 * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0059] *; | [A]JP2003114181 (JEOL LTD) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0029] * | [A] - NAKAMOTO KEIICHI ET AL, "Development of low-temperature and high vacuum atomic force microscope with freeze-fracture function", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20010201), vol. 72, no. 2, doi:10.1063/1.1342033, ISSN 0034-6748, pages 1445 - 1448, XP012038982 [A] 1-5 * figures 1,3,4 * * paragraph [0III] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1342033 | by applicant | JP2612395B | JP2001153760 |