EP3173995 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SHARING CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Facebook, Inc. 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2017/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ragavan, Srinivasan c/o Facebook, Inc. 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
Bernstein, Aaron, Samuel c/o Facebook, Inc. 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 03 /
Leonard, Pryor William c/o Facebook, Inc. 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2017/22] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/22] | Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 16171951.3 | 30.05.2016 | [2017/22] | Priority number, date | US201514951280 | 24.11.2015 Original published format: US201514951280 | WO2015US62796 | 25.11.2015 Original published format: PCT/US2015/062796 | [2017/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3173995 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10, G06Q50/00, H04M1/725 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP);
G06Q50/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] |
Former [2017/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR GEMEINSAMEN INHALTSNUTZUNG | [2017/22] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SHARING CONTENT | [2017/22] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LE PARTAGE DE CONTENU | [2017/22] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 11.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 23.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.11.2020 | 27.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/16] | 11.12.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/16] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.01.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 23.01.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.02.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014059231 (CHOI SUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,7-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0034] - [0058] , [0071] - [0131] - [0238] - [0246] - [0297] - [0335] - [0354] - [0386] - [0412] - [0423] * * Claims 1-26 * [I] 6; | [I]US2015081783 (GONG MICHELLE [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] - [0020] - [0027] , [0029] , [0030] , [0032] - [0043] - [0049] - [0055] * * particulary relevant is paragraph 49 * |