EP3252324 - ACCESS BARRIER FOR MOUNTING ON AN ELEMENT FOR FIXING OR LOCKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Techno-Consult GmbH & Co. KG Schwarzberger Weg 21 83334 Inzell / DE | [2017/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wallner, Manfred Schwarzberger Weg 21 83334 Inzell / DE | [2017/49] | Representative(s) | Naessens, Stephan Patentanwaltskanzlei Stephan Naessens Nonntal 17 83471 Berchtesgaden / DE | [2017/49] | Application number, filing date | 16172834.0 | 03.06.2016 | [2017/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3252324 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16B41/00, E05B47/00 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
F16B41/005 (EP);
B60B3/165 (EP);
E05B13/001 (EP);
E05B35/008 (EP);
E05B47/0038 (EP);
E05C3/042 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUGANGSSPERRE ZUM AUFSETZEN AUF EIN ELEMENT ZUM BEFESTIGEN ODER VERRIEGELN | [2017/49] | English: | ACCESS BARRIER FOR MOUNTING ON AN ELEMENT FOR FIXING OR LOCKING | [2017/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BLOCAGE DESTINER A FIXER OU VERROUILLER UN ELEMENT | [2017/49] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 16.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1072740 (MOTTURA SERRATURE DI SICUREZZA [IT]) [X] 1-7,9,11-14 * paragraph [0020]; figure - * [A] 10; | [XAI]US2007113605 (LOPEZ JESUS [FR]) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0033]; figure - * [A] 10 [I] 8; | [X]JPS61105201 (OSAKA KANAGU KK) [X] 1,14 * abstract *; | [X]DE1800106 (KIYIYASU WAKE, et al) [X] 1,14 * figure - *; | [X]GB2521629 (CASTELL SAFETY INTERNAT LTD [GB]) [X] 1,14 * abstract *; | [X]US3518855 (WAKE KIYOYASU) [X] 1,14 * figures 10-13 *; | [A]WO9832617 (LEES JOHN SIDNEY [GB]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]CH478323 (HUWIL WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * figure - * | by applicant | JPS6018401 |