EP3090716 - POWERED ROLL-IN COTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferno-Washington, Inc. 70 Weil Way Wilmington, OH 45177-9371 / US | [2016/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VALENTINO, Nicholas V. 1904 Wyoming Street Dayton, OH 45410 / US | 02 /
PALASTRO, Matthew 5992 Pear Tree Way Grove City, OH 43123 / US | 03 /
SHEN, Zhen Y. 10459 Cindarella Drive Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | 04 /
WELLS, Timothy R. 9224 North State Route 138 Hillsboro, OH 45133 / US | 05 /
SCHROEDER, Timothy Paul 6557 Palmetto Drive Mason, OH 45040 / US | 06 /
MARKHAM, Joshua James 1219 Village Glen Drive Batavia, OH 45103 / US | 07 /
POTAK, Robert L. 17085 Woodlawn Court Strongsville, OH 44149 / US | [2016/45] | Representative(s) | Moore, Michael Richard, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2016/45] | Application number, filing date | 16172966.0 | 13.01.2011 | [2016/45] | Priority number, date | US20100294658P | 13.01.2010 Original published format: US 294658 P | [2016/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3090716 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3090716 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61G1/02, A61G1/056, A61G1/04, // A61G3/02, A61G7/012, A61G3/08, F15B15/08 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
A61G1/0562 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61G1/0212 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61G1/0206 (CN,KR,US);
A61G1/0256 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61G1/0262 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61G1/0275 (CN,KR,US);
A61G1/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61G1/048 (CN,KR,US);
A61G1/056 (CN,KR,US);
A61G3/0218 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61G7/005 (CN,US);
A61G7/012 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61G7/018 (CN,US);
A61G1/02 (EP,CN,US);
A61G1/0243 (EP,CN,US);
A61G2203/40 (EP,CN,US);
A61G2203/42 (EP,CN,US);
A61G2203/44 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] |
Former [2016/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANGETRIEBENE FAHRBARE PATIENTENBETTEN | [2016/45] | English: | POWERED ROLL-IN COTS | [2016/45] | French: | CIVIÈRES ROULANTES MOTORISÉES | [2016/45] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 19.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 22.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 20.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11733348.4 / EP2523642 | Divisional application(s) | EP18192127.1 / EP3437613 | EP20163455.7 / EP3689313 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 22.08.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 22.08.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.09.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2011 | AL | 05.09.2018 | AT | 05.09.2018 | CY | 05.09.2018 | EE | 05.09.2018 | HR | 05.09.2018 | LT | 05.09.2018 | LV | 05.09.2018 | MC | 05.09.2018 | MK | 05.09.2018 | RO | 05.09.2018 | RS | 05.09.2018 | SI | 05.09.2018 | SM | 05.09.2018 | TR | 05.09.2018 | BG | 05.12.2018 | GR | 06.12.2018 | IS | 05.01.2019 | PT | 05.01.2019 | LU | 13.01.2019 | MT | 13.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 13.01.2011 | |
AL | 05.09.2018 | ||
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
MT | 13.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
MT | 13.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
MT | 13.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
LU | 13.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SI | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
PT | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
AT | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | HR | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
GR | 06.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 05.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]NL8901747 (FERDINAND WILLEMSEN) [X] 1,2,4-8 * page 5, line 12 - line 40; figures 1a, 1b, 2 * * page 8, line 33 - page 9, line 27; figure 11 * * page 7, line 28 - page 8, line 32; figures 8a-10c *; | [A]US5084922 (LOUIT CLAUDE [FR]) [A] 1,4,5,8* column 4, line 36 - column 9, line 52; figures 1-9; claims 1, 2 *; | [X]US5509159 (DU-BOIS ROBERT L [AU]) [X] 1-9,11 * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 46; figures 1-8 *; | [X]EP1698314 (STRYKER CORP [US]) [X] 1,4-8,11 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0073]; figures 1-22 * | Examination | US2009172883 | by applicant | US4037871 | US4921295 | WO0170161 |