EP3255113 - ADHESIVE AND/OR SEALANT COMPOSITION WITH HIGH INITIAL TACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soudal Everdongenlaan 20 2300 Turnhout / BE | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DEN PLAS, Dave Brasschaatsteenweg 152 2920 Kalmthout / BE | 02 /
GEBOES, Peter Kapellestraat 230 2630 Aartselaar / BE | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/50] | Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 16173598.0 | 08.06.2016 | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3255113 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C09J201/10, C08K3/36, C08K5/54, C08K5/541, C08K5/544, C08K5/548, C09J143/04, C08K9/06, C08L101/10 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
C09J201/10 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP);
C08K5/54 (EP);
C08K5/5415 (EP);
C08K5/544 (EP,US);
C08K5/548 (EP);
C08K9/06 (EP);
C08L101/10 (EP);
C08K2201/006 (EP);
C08K5/5445 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L101/10, C08K3/36, C08K5/54 (EP);
C08L101/10, C08K5/54, C08K9/06 (EP);
C09J201/10, C08K3/36, C08K5/54 (EP);
C09J201/10, C08K5/54, C08K9/06 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] |
Former [2017/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEBSTOFF- UND/ODER DICHTSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2017/50] | English: | ADHESIVE AND/OR SEALANT COMPOSITION WITH HIGH INITIAL TACK | [2017/50] | French: | ADHÉSIF ET/OU COMPOSITION D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ | [2017/50] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 11.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005211580 (KASZUBSKI GLEN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * claim 1 * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0107] * * tables 1,2 *; | [A]EP2682432 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15* claims 1,11 *; | [AD]WO2014033273 (BOSTIK SA [FR]) [AD] 1-15 * claim 1 * | by applicant | EP0240044 | US4962152 | EP0819749 | EP1043356 | WO2004090060 | WO2006078756 | WO2009130298 | US8076401 | US2012298300 | EP2581406 | WO2014033273 | US2014094553 | US8697815 | WO2014187865 | US2015203624 |