EP3103534 - INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM AND INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/50] | INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, CONTROLLER DEVICE AND ACCESSORY | ||
[2022/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nintendo Co., Ltd. 11-1, Hokotate-cho, Kamitoba Minami-ku Kyoto 601-8501 / JP | [2016/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOIZUMI, Yoshiaki c/o Nintendo Co., Ltd. 11-1 Kamitoba, Hokotate-cho Minami-ku Kyoto 601-8501 / JP | 02 /
EHARA, Yui c/o Nintendo Co., Ltd. 11-1 Kamitoba, Hokotate-cho Minami-ku Kyoto 601-8501 / JP | 03 /
NISHIKAWA, Munetaka c/o Nintendo Co., Ltd. 11-1 Kamitoba, Hokotate-cho Minami-ku Kyoto, 601-8501 / JP | 04 /
KAWAI, Kochi c/o Nintendo Co., Ltd. 11-1 Kamitoba, Hokotate-cho Minami-ku Kyoto 601-8501 / JP | 05 /
KENICHI, Mae c/o Nintendo Co., Ltd. 11-1 Kamitoba, Hokotate-cho Minami-ku Kyoto 601-8501 / JP | [2016/50] | Representative(s) | Karl, Christof Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2016/50] | Application number, filing date | 16173845.5 | 10.06.2016 | [2016/50] | Priority number, date | JP20150119707 | 12.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015119707 | [2016/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3103534 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3103534 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3103534 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/23, A63F13/24, A63F13/92, A63F13/98 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
A63F13/23 (EP,US);
A63F13/24 (EP,CN,US);
A63F13/2145 (CN,US);
A63F13/22 (CN);
A63F13/235 (US);
A63F13/25 (CN);
A63F13/26 (US);
A63F13/285 (CN);
A63F13/31 (US);
A63F13/843 (EP,US);
A63F13/92 (EP,US);
A63F13/98 (EP,US);
G06F1/1607 (US);
G06F1/1671 (US);
G06F1/1684 (US);
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06F3/02 (US);
G06F3/0304 (EP,US);
G06F3/033 (US);
G06F3/0338 (US);
G06F3/0346 (EP,US);
G06F3/1423 (US);
G08C17/02 (EP,US);
G08C19/00 (EP,US);
A63F2300/1075 (CN,US);
A63F2300/204 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/50] | A63F13/24, A63F13/92, A63F13/98 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/31] |
Former [2016/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/43] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM AND INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE | [2022/43] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2022/43] |
Former [2016/50] | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ZUBEHÖR | ||
Former [2016/50] | INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, CONTROLLER DEVICE AND ACCESSORY | ||
Former [2016/50] | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ET ACCESSOIRE | Examination procedure | 10.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/31] | 27.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.05.2022 | 25.05.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23161231.8 / EP4212221 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.2023 | CZ | 26.04.2023 | DK | 26.04.2023 | EE | 26.04.2023 | ES | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | IT | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | MC | 26.04.2023 | NL | 26.04.2023 | PL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SE | 26.04.2023 | SI | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | IE | 10.06.2023 | LU | 10.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | NO | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.07.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | PT | 28.08.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
IE | 10.06.2023 | ||
LU | 10.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
IE | 10.06.2023 | ||
LU | 10.06.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
LU | 10.06.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 26.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2310481 (TOP GAME & COMPANY LTD [TW]); | [I]US2013058659 (UMEZU RYUJI [JP], et al); | [I]US2015018101 (SCHOENITH JOHN M [US], et al) | Examination | US2003100263 | US2013154542 | US2015031452 | by applicant | JP2011108256 |