EP3112385 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A POLYMER COMPRISING MONOMERIC UNITS OF ETHYLENE, AN -OLEFIN AND A VINYL NORBORNENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arlanxeo Netherlands B.V. Urmonderbaan 24 6167 RD Geleen / NL | [2017/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DOREMAELE, Gerardus Henricus Josephus Gulikstraat 18 6151 BG Munstergeleen / NL | 02 /
WINDMULLER, Jozef Hubert Peter Rooseveltstraat 16 6374 JC Landgraaf / NL | [2019/34] |
Former [2017/01] | 01 /
VAN DOREMAELE, Gerardus Henricus Josephus Gulikstraat 18 6151 BG Mustergeleen / NL | ||
02 /
WINDMULLER, Jozef Hubert Peter Rooseveltstraat 16 6374 JC Landgraaf / NL | Representative(s) | Marx, Thiemo Patrick, et al Arlanxeo Deutschland GmbH Law-Intellectual Property Hans-Imhoff-Straße 6 50679 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/02] | Marx, Thiemo Patrick, et al Arlanxeo Deutschland GmbH Legal - Patents & Trademarks Kennedyplatz 1 50679 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2017/01] | Herbold, Matthias LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LEX-IPR Kennedyplatz 1 50569 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 16173894.3 | 29.06.2004 | [2017/01] | Priority number, date | WO2003NL00503 | 09.07.2003 Original published format: PCT/NL0300/503 | [2017/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3112385 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3112385 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/18, C08F4/6592 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
C08F210/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08F10/00 (KR);
C08F4/659 (KR);
C08F2420/02 (EP,US);
C08F2420/04 (EP,US);
C08F4/65908 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F210/18, C08F4/6592 (EP,US);
C08F210/18, C08F210/06, C08F236/20, C08F2500/25, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/03 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/33] |
Former [2017/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES POLYMERS MIT MONOMEREINHEITEN AUS ETHYLEN, EINEM OLEFIN UND EINEM VINYL-NORBORNEN | [2017/01] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A POLYMER COMPRISING MONOMERIC UNITS OF ETHYLENE, AN -OLEFIN AND A VINYL NORBORNENE | [2017/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UN POLYMÈRE COMPRENANT DES UNITÉS MONOMÈRES D'ÉTHYLÈNE, UNE OLÉFINE ET DU NORBORNÈNE DE VINYLE | [2017/01] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 07.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04748688.1 / EP1641847 | EP10183547.8 / EP2261269 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2004 | AT | 08.01.2020 | CY | 08.01.2020 | CZ | 08.01.2020 | DK | 08.01.2020 | EE | 08.01.2020 | ES | 08.01.2020 | FI | 08.01.2020 | MC | 08.01.2020 | PL | 08.01.2020 | RO | 08.01.2020 | SE | 08.01.2020 | SI | 08.01.2020 | SK | 08.01.2020 | TR | 08.01.2020 | BG | 08.04.2020 | GR | 09.04.2020 | PT | 31.05.2020 | IE | 29.06.2020 | LU | 29.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/24] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 29.06.2020 | ||
LU | 29.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
IE | 29.06.2020 | ||
LU | 29.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
LU | 29.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 08.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | JPH09241326 [ ] (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [A]EP1162214 (NOVA CHEM INT SA [CH]) [A] 1-3* claims 1,5-7; tables A1-B4b *; | [A] - INAGAKI, KATSUNARI ET AL, "Diene-modified ethylene-.alpha.-olefin copolymers and their manufacture", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1997:618783, URL: STN, XP002301032 [A] 1-3 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0765908 | US6063879 | EP1162214 | WO02070569 | - H.C. BOOIJ, KAUTSCHUK + GUMMI KUNSTSTOFFE, vol. 44, no. 2, pages 128 - 130 |